This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/21/2021 at 08:55:47 (UTC).

Dinwiddie County v. Mallinckrodt, PLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/23/2020 Dinwiddie County filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Mallinckrodt, PLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-OP-45291

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dinwiddie County, Virginia

Defendants

McKesson Corporation

MYLAN INSTITUTIONAL INC

Express Scripts Holding Company

Mallinckrodt LLC

Insource, Inc.

Mallinckrodt PLC

CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.

Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Allergan PLC

OptumRX, Inc.

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

CaremarkPCS, L.L.C.

Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc.

Actavis LLC

Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic

CVS TN Distribution

Caremark, L.L.C.

31 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Edgar Spivey

Attorney at Kaufman & Canoles

150 West Main Street

Norfolk, VA 23510

Tyler Christopher Southall

Attorney at Dinwiddie County Attorney's Office

P. O. Drawer 70

Dinwiddie, VA 23841

Patrick Hugh O'Donnell

Attorney at Kaufman & Canoles

150 West Main Street

Norfolk, VA 23510

Richard Johan Conrod, Jr.

Attorney at Kaufman & Canoles

P.O. Box 3037

Norfolk, VA 23514

Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin C. Block

Attorney at Covington & Burling

One City Center, 850 10Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Jon Myer Talotta

Attorney at Hogan Lovells

9Th Floor, 7930 Jones Branch Drive

Mclean, VA 22102

Rebecca C. Mandel

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US - Washington

555 Thirteenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Matthew I. Menchel

Attorney at Kobre & Kim

201 South Biscayne Blvd.

Miami, FL 33131

Adriana Riviere-Badell

Attorney at Kobre & Kim - Miami

201 South Biscayne Blvd.

Miami, FL 33131

Steven G. Kobre

Attorney at Kobre & Kim - New York

800 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Sarah Byer Miller

Attorney at Bass, Berry & Sims

150 Third Avenue South

Nashville, TN 37201

Paul Christopher Kuhnel

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois

310 First Street, Suite 405

Roanoke, VA 24011

Blair Gerard Brown

Attorney at Zuckerman Spaeder LLP (M St)

1800 M Street Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20036

Samuel Perry Coburn

Attorney at Christian and Barton

909 East Main Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Jonathan Patrick Floyd

Attorney at Troutman Sanders

1001 Haxall Point

Richmond, VA 23219

Brian D. Boone

Attorney at Alston & Bird

101 South Tryon Street

Charlotte, NC 28280

Other Attorneys

Brent Ryan Gary

Attorney at Reed Smith

3110 Fairview Park Drive

Falls Church, VA 22042

William George Laxton, Jr.

Attorney at Jones Day

51 Louisiana Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

Christopher T. Pickens

Attorney at Hogan Lovells

17Th Floor, 8350 Broad Street

Tysons, VA 22102

Alisha Marie Crovetto

Attorney at Jones Day (DC)

51 Louisiana Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20001

10 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

44 #1

*Restricted*

#44

#43

#42

#41

#40

#39

38 #1

Proposed Order

#38

35 #1

Proposed Order

#35

#27

#9

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Virginia Eastern. Case number 3:20-cv-00606. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase electronically transferred to Northern District of Ohio per #43 MDL Transfer Order. (asho, ) [Transferred from vaed on 12/23/2020.] (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) MDL Transfer Order - IN RE: NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE LITIGATION. MDL Number 2804. Signed by Karen K. Caldwell, Chair, Multi District Litigation Panel on 12/16/2020. (asho, ). [Transferred from vaed on 12/23/2020.] (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) NOTICE by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC Notice of Suggestion of Pendency of Bankruptcy and Automatic Stay of Proceedings (Miller, Sarah) [Transferred from vaed on 12/23/2020.] (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION to Stay filed by Va Dinwiddie County. (Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vaed on 12/23/2020.] (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ORDER (Granting Defendants' Motion for Temporary Stay) it is ORDERED that Defendants' Motion #19 is GRANTED and this matter is STAYED pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's determination regarding transfer of this case. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 09/23/2020. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from vaed on 12/23/2020.] (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF JUSTIN M. SIZEMORE TO WITHDRAW APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION - Pending is the Motion of Justin M. Sizemore to Withdraw Appearance on Behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation in the above-referenced matter. Upon consideration, the Court hereby GRANTS the Motion of Justin M. Sizemore to Withdraw Appearance on Behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 9/17/2020. (smej, ) [Transferred from vaed on 12/23/2020.] (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sizemore, Justin) [Transferred from vaed on 12/23/2020.] (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Va Dinwiddie County. (Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vaed on 12/23/2020.] (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Memorandum in Support re: #35 CONDITIONAL MOTION for Order Implementing Automatic Stay Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62(a) filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc. (Scott, Emily). Modified docket text at filing attorney's request on 9/11/2020. (sbea,) [Transferred from vaed on 12/23/2020.] (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Julian W. Park and Certification of Local Counsel Emily M. Scott Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7342318. by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vaed on 12/23/2020.] (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 12/23/2020.] (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by OptumRX, Inc.. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 12/23/2020.] (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Optum, Inc.. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 12/23/2020.] (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Turner A. Broughton on behalf of Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 12/23/2020.] (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letter from the Clerk to all counsel not admitted in the USCA EDVA re: Local Rule 83.1. (copy enclosed). (tjoh, ) [Transferred from vaed on 12/23/2020.] (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from vaed on 12/23/2020.] (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.. (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vaed on 12/23/2020.] (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vaed on 12/23/2020.] (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7340485.), filed by Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - List of Opioid Cases, #2 Exhibit 2 - (1 of 5) State Court File, #3 Exhibit 2 - (2 of 5) State Court File, #4 Exhibit 2 - (3 of 5) State Court File, #5 Exhibit 2 - (4 of 5) State Court File, #6 Exhibit 2 - (5 of 5) State Court File, #7 Exhibit 3 - Civil Cover Sheet)(Scott, Emily) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/7/2020) (tjoh, ). [Transferred from vaed on 12/23/2020.] (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dinwiddie County, Virginia is a litigant

Latest cases where CAREMARKPCS, L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C. is a litigant