Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/08/2021 at 09:54:09 (UTC).

Dinh Van Phan v. Kroger Texas LP

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 Dinh Van Phan filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Kroger Texas LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jane J. Boyle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00822

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane J. Boyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dinh Van Phan

Defendant

Kroger Texas LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Omar Gutierrez

Attorney at CAO & Associates PC

3212 N. Jupiter Road, Suite 128

Garland, TX 75044

Michael Cao

Attorney at CAO & Associates PC

3212 N Jupiter Road, Suite 128

Garland, TX 75044

Michael Hoc Cao

Attorney at CAO & Associates PC

3212 N Jupiter Rd, Suite 128

Garland, TX 75044

Defendant Attorneys

Hope Zimlich Miranda

Attorney at Peavler|Briscoe

2215 Westgate Plaza

Grapevine, TX 76051

B Kyle Briscoe

Attorney at Peavler|Briscoe

2215 Westgate Plaza

Grapevine, TX 76051

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER: #7 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice filed by Kroger Texas LP is Granted. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/7/2021) (svc) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice filed by Kroger Texas LP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zimlich Miranda, Hope) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

5 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order

#5

(#5) MOTION Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement filed by Dinh Van Phan (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Cao, Michael) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#4

(#4) STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 5/3/2021. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 4/12/2021) (svc) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kroger Texas, L.P.. (Briscoe, B) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

1 #4

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #3

Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit(s)

1 #1

Additional Page(s)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Kroger Texas, L.P.. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-11781944) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Briscoe, B) (Attachment 3 replaced to flatten on 4/12/2021) (jmg). (Entered: 04/09/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: #7 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice filed by Kroger Texas LP is Granted. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/7/2021) (svc) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice filed by Kroger Texas LP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zimlich Miranda, Hope) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated per 6 Electronic Order. (axm) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #5 Joint Motion to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement. In light of the parties' settlement, the Court ORDERS the parties to submit a joint stipulation of dismissal or agreed final judgment on or before June 2, 2021. All other deadlines in this case are stayed. The Clerk of Court is directed to administratively close this case. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 5/3/2021) (chmb) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement filed by Dinh Van Phan (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Cao, Michael) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Mon Apr 12 14:37:23 CDT 2021 (crt) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 5/3/2021. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 4/12/2021) (svc) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Fri Apr 9 17:20:54 CDT 2021 (crt) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kroger Texas, L.P.. (Briscoe, B) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Kroger Texas, L.P.. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-11781944) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Briscoe, B) (Attachment 3 replaced to flatten on 4/12/2021) (jmg). (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kroger Texas LP is a litigant