This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/29/2021 at 09:14:09 (UTC).

Dines v. Rudra Lodging, LP et al

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 Dines filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Rudra Lodging, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Reed C. O'Connor. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00803

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Reed C. O'Connor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ariel Dines

Defendants

Rudra Lodging, LP

Vijay Patel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles Leonard Scalise

Attorney at Ross Scalise Law Group

1104 San Antonio Street

Austin, TX 78701

Fernando M Bustos

Attorney at Bustos Law Firm PC

Po Box 1980

Lubbock, TX 79408-1980

Steven Robert Samples

Attorney at Samples Ames PLLC

2727 Lbj Freeway, Suite 922

Dallas, TX 75234

Daniel Bret Ross

Attorney at Ross Scalise Law Group

1104 San Antonio Street

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Ariel Dines (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Scalise, Charles) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER: Before the Court is the Notice of Settlement (ECF No. #7 ), filed August 11, 2021. The notice informed the Court that the case has settled. ECF No. #7 . Accordingly, the parties are ORDERED to file the appropriate dismissal papers - a stipulation of dismissal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) or an agreed motion with corresponding proposed order under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) - with the Clerk's Office no later than September 10, 2021. All pending deadlines are hereby STAYED and the trial setting VACATED pending the filing of appropriate dismissal papers by the parties. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 8/12/2021) (pef) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Ariel Dines (Scalise, Charles) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Vijay Patel, served on 07/19/2021; Rudra Lodging, LP, served on 07/19/2021. (Scalise, Charles) Modified docket text on 7/27/2021 (pef). (Entered: 07/26/2021)

#5

(#5) AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ariel Dines re: #2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Scalise, Charles) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Vijay Patel, Rudra Lodging, LP. (pef) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O'Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (pef) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#2

(#2) ***PER FILING ATTORNEY, DISREGARD - INCORRECT PDF...SEE ENTRY #5 FOR CORRECTED FILING***CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ariel Dines. (Scalise, Charles) Modified text on 7/1/2021 (tln). (Entered: 06/30/2021)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Ariel Dines. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12017130) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Scalise, Charles) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated per #9 Notice of Dismissal. (bdb) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Ariel Dines (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Scalise, Charles) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: Before the Court is the Notice of Settlement (ECF No. #7 ), filed August 11, 2021. The notice informed the Court that the case has settled. ECF No. #7 . Accordingly, the parties are ORDERED to file the appropriate dismissal papers - a stipulation of dismissal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) or an agreed motion with corresponding proposed order under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) - with the Clerk's Office no later than September 10, 2021. All pending deadlines are hereby STAYED and the trial setting VACATED pending the filing of appropriate dismissal papers by the parties. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 8/12/2021) (pef) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Ariel Dines (Scalise, Charles) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Vijay Patel, served on 07/19/2021; Rudra Lodging, LP, served on 07/19/2021. (Scalise, Charles) Modified docket text on 7/27/2021 (pef). (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ariel Dines re: #2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Scalise, Charles) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Vijay Patel, Rudra Lodging, LP. (pef) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O'Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (pef) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ***PER FILING ATTORNEY, DISREGARD - INCORRECT PDF...SEE ENTRY #5 FOR CORRECTED FILING***CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ariel Dines. (Scalise, Charles) Modified text on 7/1/2021 (tln). (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Ariel Dines. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12017130) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Scalise, Charles) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven Robert Samples

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel B. Ross

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles L. Scalise

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fernando M Bustos