This case was last updated from PACER on 11/19/2019 at 07:41:04 (UTC).

Dimas et al v. Salazar et al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2019 Dimas filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Salazar. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jerry H. Ritter, Kirtan Khalsa and William P. Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00872

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jerry H. Ritter

Presiding Judges

Kirtan Khalsa

William P. Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Marry Dimas

Frank A Sanchez, Sr

Frank Sanchez, Jr

Defendants

Anthony Morales

FNU LNU

Jonathan Todachine

Pat Salazar

McKinley County Sheriff's Office

Monty Yazzie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William G. Stripp

Attorney at Law Office of William G Stripp

Po Box 159, 3279 State Highway 53

Ramah, NM 87321

Defendant Attorneys

Mark L. Drebing

Attorney at New Mexico Association of Counties

111 Lomas Blvd Nw, Suite 424

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Brandon Huss

Attorney at New Mexico Association of Counties

444 Galisteo St

Santa Fe, NM 87501

Nicholas S. Autio

Attorney at New Mexico Association of Counties

111 Lomas Blvd Nw Suite 424

Albuquerque, NM 87102

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Marry Dimas, Frank Sanchez, Jr, Frank A Sanchez, Sr OF DISMISSAL (Stripp, William) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by William G. Stripp on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Stripp, William) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#3

(#3) ERRATA re #1 Notice of Removal, by Anthony Morales, Jonathan Todachine, Monty Yazzie (Huss, Brandon) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit Exh C. - NMCourts.com lookup page

1 #2

Exhibit Exh B - SUMMONS

1 #1

Exhibit Exh A. P's Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Monty Yazzie, Jonathan Todachine, Anthony Morales from Eleventh Judicial District Court, case number D-1113-CV-2018-00473. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Monty Yazzie, Jonathan Todachine, Anthony Morales. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A. P's Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exh B - SUMMONS, #3 Exhibit Exh C. - NMCourts.com lookup page, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Drebing, Mark) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE by Marry Dimas, Frank Sanchez, Jr, Frank A Sanchez, Sr OF DISMISSAL (Stripp, William) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by William G. Stripp on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Stripp, William) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • (#6) NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 4. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • (#5) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ERRATA re #1 Notice of Removal, by Anthony Morales, Jonathan Todachine, Monty Yazzie (Huss, Brandon) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • (#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (aek) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (aek) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6684864 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Anthony Morales, Jonathan Todachine, Monty Yazzie (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Drebing, Mark) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Monty Yazzie, Jonathan Todachine, Anthony Morales from Eleventh Judicial District Court, case number D-1113-CV-2018-00473. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Monty Yazzie, Jonathan Todachine, Anthony Morales. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A. P's Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exh B - SUMMONS, #3 Exhibit Exh C. - NMCourts.com lookup page, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Drebing, Mark) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less