This case was last updated from PACER on 04/26/2021 at 09:54:35 (UTC).

Dillard et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 Dillard filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy Percy and Michael P. Mills. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00039

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Roy Percy

Presiding Judge

Michael P. Mills

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Yolanda Dillard

Calvin Dillard

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Arati C Furness

Attorney at Fears Nachawati PLLC

5473 Blair Rd.

Dallas, TX 75231

Matthew Ryan McCarley

Attorney at Fears Nachawati PLLC

5473 Blair Rd.

Dallas, TX 75231

Kelly Chermack

Attorney at Fears Nachawati Law Firm

5473 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75231

David Shelton

Attorney at Shelton Davis, PLLC

P.O. Box 2541, 1223 Jackson Avenue East, Ste 202

Oxford, MS 38655

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B. North, Jr.

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH, LLP

201 17Th Street Nw, Suite 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

J. Carter Thompson, Jr.

Attorney at BAKER, DONELSON, BEARMAN & CALDWELL - Jackson

One Eastover Center, 100 Vision Dr., Ste. 400, Post Office Box 14167

Jackson, MS 39236-4167

Elizabeth Ross Hadley

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG

300 West 6Th Street, Suite 2050

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) ORDER denying #21 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/5/2021. (yf)

#23

(#23) NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 7/23/2021 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)

#22

(#22) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #21 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Hadley, Elizabeth)

#21

(#21) Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Hadley, Elizabeth)

#19

(#19) ORDER granting #17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Arati C Furness and Matthew Ryan McCarley terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/29/2021. (yf)

#18

(#18) ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Kelly Chermack. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/29/2021. (yf)

#17

(#17) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Calvin Dillard, Yolanda Dillard. (Shelton, David)

16 #2

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

16 #1

Exhibit CCertificate of Good Standing

6 #10

Exhibit Motions in Limine Orders

6 #9

Exhibit Miscellaneous Orders

#6

(#6) CERTIFIED AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). Signed by Senior United States District Judge David G. Campbell on 2/11/21. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bard Docket Sheet (Main MDL Case), #2 Exhibit Case Management Orders, #3 Exhibit Case Mgt Order No. 47, #4 Exhibit Daubert Orders, #5 Exhibit Deposition Designation Orders, #6 Exhibit Discovery and Privilege Orders, #7 Exhibit Discovery Orders, #8 Exhibit Master and Short-Form Pleadings, #9 Exhibit Miscellaneous Orders, #10 Exhibit Motions in Limine Orders) (jla)

5 #1

*Restricted*

#5

(#5) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-02764. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.

#4

(#4) AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.] (Entered: 02/12/2021)

#3

(#3) *AMENDED By Doc. #4 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/17/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.] (Entered: 02/11/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16856795 filed by Yolanda Dillard, Calvin Dillard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER denying #21 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/5/2021. (yf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 7/23/2021 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #21 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Hadley, Elizabeth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Hadley, Elizabeth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • Docket(#20) TEXT ONLY ORDER requiring telephonic case management conference. Counsel should call conference line 888-363-4735 (participant number 4317261) at previously scheduled time. There will be no in-person attendance permitted. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/31/21. No document attached. (rtc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER granting #17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Arati C Furness and Matthew Ryan McCarley terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/29/2021. (yf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Kelly Chermack. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/29/2021. (yf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Calvin Dillard, Yolanda Dillard. (Shelton, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Kelly Chermack,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-1925960) by Calvin Dillard, Yolanda Dillard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CCertificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Shelton, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Shelton on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Shelton, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2021 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/1/21. (rtc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE of Failure by Counsel to be Admitted to Practice Re: Richard B. North, Jr, Matthew Ryan McCarley, Arati C Furness (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFIED AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). Signed by Senior United States District Judge David G. Campbell on 2/11/21. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bard Docket Sheet (Main MDL Case), #2 Exhibit Case Management Orders, #3 Exhibit Case Mgt Order No. 47, #4 Exhibit Daubert Orders, #5 Exhibit Deposition Designation Orders, #6 Exhibit Discovery and Privilege Orders, #7 Exhibit Discovery Orders, #8 Exhibit Master and Short-Form Pleadings, #9 Exhibit Miscellaneous Orders, #10 Exhibit Motions in Limine Orders) (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-02764. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketRemark: Transferring Case to the Northern District of Mississippi via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.] (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) *AMENDED By Doc. #4 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/17/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.] (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Docket(#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-02764-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16856795 filed by Yolanda Dillard, Calvin Dillard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth Ross Hadley