This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 06:03:48 (UTC).

Diiorio et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Diiorio filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Johnson Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sandra J. Feuerstein and Arlene R. Lindsay. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-06876

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sandra J. Feuerstein

Referral Judge

Arlene R. Lindsay

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Celesta Diiorio

Craig Vickers

Defendants

Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian A. Goldstein

Attorney at Cellino & Barnes PC

2500 Main Place Tower, 350 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14202-3725

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Certified JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-191): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the District of New Jersey for the reasons stated in the order of October 4, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Freda L. Wolfson. (Florio, Lisa) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#7

(#7) JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-191): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to theDistrict of New Jersey for the reasons stated in the order of October 4, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Freda L. Wolfson. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. (Florio, Lisa) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Related Actions filed by Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., filed with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Ortiz, Grisel) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#5

(#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

3 #1

Proposed Summons Proposed Waiver of Service by Summons

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Defendants on 12/06/2019 by Celesta Diiorio. Waiver of Service due by 1/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Proposed Waiver of Service by Summons) (Goldstein, Brian) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Celesta Diiorio (Goldstein, Brian) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. filing fee $400, receipt number ANYEDC-12133206, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by Celesta Diiorio, Craig Vickers. (Goldstein, Brian) Modified on 12/6/2019 (Rodin, Deanna). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCase transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in District of New Jersey [LIVE] as case 3:20-cv-00099, filed 01/03/2020. (Tirado, Chelsea) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCase transferred to District of New Jersey. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Florio, Lisa) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certified JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-191): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the District of New Jersey for the reasons stated in the order of October 4, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Freda L. Wolfson. (Florio, Lisa) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-191): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to theDistrict of New Jersey for the reasons stated in the order of October 4, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Freda L. Wolfson. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. (Florio, Lisa) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Related Actions filed by Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., filed with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Ortiz, Grisel) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Defendants on 12/06/2019 by Celesta Diiorio. Waiver of Service due by 1/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Proposed Waiver of Service by Summons) (Goldstein, Brian) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Celesta Diiorio (Goldstein, Brian) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. filing fee $400, receipt number ANYEDC-12133206, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by Celesta Diiorio, Craig Vickers. (Goldstein, Brian) Modified on 12/6/2019 (Rodin, Deanna). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less