This case was last updated from PACER on 07/07/2020 at 08:43:14 (UTC).

Dignitti v. The Brattleboro Retreat

Case Summary

On 05/08/2020 Dignitti filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against The Brattleboro Retreat. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Vermont District. The Judge overseeing this case is Christina Reiss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00072

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Vermont District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christina Reiss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elisabeth Dignitti

Defendant

The Brattleboro Retreat

Not Classified By Court

ENE Evaluator

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John C. Mabie, Esq.

Attorney at Corum Mabie Cook Prodan Angell & Secrest, P.L.C.

45 Linden Street

Brattleboro, VT 05301-2966

Defendant Attorney

Martha Van Oot, Esq.

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

100 International Drive, Suite 363

Portsmouth, NH 03801

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Gregory S. Clayton, Esq.

Attorney at Clayton Mediation, LLC

P.O. Box 1016

Camden, ME 04843-1016

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) STIPULATED DISCOVERY SCHEDULE/ORDER Discovery due by 1/15/2021. Motions due by 3/1/2021. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 9/15/2020 at 09:00 AM. Ready for Trial by 6/1/2021. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 6/22/2020. (kp) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

16 #1

Certificate of Service

#16

(#16) PROPOSED Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order by Elisabeth Dignitti. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mabie, John) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

#15

(#15) ASSIGNED Early Neutral Evaluator: Gregory S. Clayton, Esq. (eh) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

14 #1

Certificate of Service

#14

(#14) EVALUATOR SELECTION Response by Elisabeth Dignitti. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mabie, John) Text clarified on 6/1/2020 (law). (Entered: 05/29/2020)

13 #2

Certificate of Service

13 #1

Exhibit A

#13

(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Strike Allegations Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(f) filed by Elisabeth Dignitti. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mabie, John) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

12 #1

Exhibit 1

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Filing #1 Notice of Removal by The Brattleboro Retreat. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (originally filed 5/7/2020 in state court)(kp) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Martha Van Oot, Esq on behalf of The Brattleboro Retreat. (originally filed 5/7/2020 in state court)(kp) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Strike Allegations Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(f) filed by The Brattleboro Retreat.(Van Oot, Martha) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Certificate of Service

1 #2

Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Brattleboro Retreat from Vermont Superior Court, Windham Unit, Civil Division, case number 20-CV-00171. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(kp) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATED DISCOVERY SCHEDULE/ORDER Discovery due by 1/15/2021. Motions due by 3/1/2021. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 9/15/2020 at 09:00 AM. Ready for Trial by 6/1/2021. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 6/22/2020. (kp) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) PROPOSED Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order by Elisabeth Dignitti. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mabie, John) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ASSIGNED Early Neutral Evaluator: Gregory S. Clayton, Esq. (eh) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) EVALUATOR SELECTION Response by Elisabeth Dignitti. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mabie, John) Text clarified on 6/1/2020 (law). (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Strike Allegations Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(f) filed by Elisabeth Dignitti. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mabie, John) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Filing #1 Notice of Removal by The Brattleboro Retreat. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (originally filed 5/7/2020 in state court)(kp) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Martha Van Oot, Esq on behalf of The Brattleboro Retreat. (originally filed 5/7/2020 in state court)(kp) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John C. Mabie, Esq on behalf of Elisabeth Dignitti. (originally filed 4/29/2020 in the state court)(kp) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: The Brattleboro Retreat waiver sent on 4/17/2020.(originally filed 4/29/2020 in state court) (kp) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) COMPLAINT against The Brattleboro Retreat filed by Elisabeth Dignitti. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (originally filed 4/29/2020 in state court)(kp) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RECEIVED FILE and copy of docket sheet from State Court. (kp) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENE LETTER re: Potential Evaluators sent; responses due by 6/1/2020. (eh) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by The Brattleboro Retreat (Van Oot, Martha) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by The Brattleboro Retreat.(Van Oot, Martha) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Strike Allegations Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(f) filed by The Brattleboro Retreat.(Van Oot, Martha) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Windham Unit, Civil Division requesting original case file and certified docket sheet. (kp) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Brattleboro Retreat from Vermont Superior Court, Windham Unit, Civil Division, case number 20-CV-00171. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(kp) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less