This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/01/2022 at 07:40:14 (UTC).

Digital Verification Systems, LLC v. Paubox, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/02/2021 Digital Verification Systems, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Paubox, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Virginia K. DeMarchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-08531

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia K. DeMarchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Digital Verification Systems, LLC

Defendant

Paubox, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen Michael Lobbin

Attorney at SML Avvocati P.C.

888 Prospect Street, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92037

Defendant Attorney

Brett Michael Schuman

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

Three Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 11/2/2021) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 11/2/2021) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#4

(#4) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Digital Verification Systems, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management LLC for Digital Verification Systems, LLC. re #1 Complaint, (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 11/2/2021) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Paubox, Inc. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2021) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#7

(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/25/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/1/2022 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2021) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Digital Verification Systems, LLC. Paubox, Inc. served on 11/8/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 11/14/2021) (Entered: 11/14/2021)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by Paubox, Inc., Digital Verification Systems, LLC. (Schuman, Brett) (Filed on 11/29/2021) Modified on 11/29/2021 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/29/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by Paubox, Inc., Digital Verification Systems, LLC. (Schuman, Brett) (Filed on 11/29/2021) Modified on 11/29/2021 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. REMINDER: No title Page. All e-filed documents require a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement. [err201] No further action is necessary Re: #8 Summons Returned Executed filed by Digital Verification Systems, LLC. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2021) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Digital Verification Systems, LLC. Paubox, Inc. served on 11/8/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 11/14/2021) (Entered: 11/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/25/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/1/2022 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2021) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Paubox, Inc. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2021) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/17/2021. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2021) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Digital Verification Systems, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management LLC for Digital Verification Systems, LLC. re #1 Complaint, (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 11/2/2021) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 11/2/2021) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 11/2/2021) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement (with jury demand) against Paubox, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16584692). Filed by Digital Verification Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 11/2/2021) Modified on 11/3/2021 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Digital Verification Systems, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brett Michael Schuman