This case was last updated from PACER on 04/19/2021 at 10:07:53 (UTC).

DigiMedia Tech, LLC v. Lenovo (United States), Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 DigiMedia Tech, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Lenovo United States , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00227

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DigiMedia Tech, LLC

Defendants

Motorola Mobility LLC

Lenovo (United States), Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stamatios Stamoulis

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Richard Charles Weinblatt

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorney

Rodger Dallery Smith, II

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

 

Court Documents

#8

#7

#6

5 #1

Summons

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendants Lenovo (United States) Inc., and Motorola Mobility LLC to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to May 12, 2021 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Lenovo (United States), Inc. answer due 5/12/2021; Motorola Mobility LLC answer due 5/12/2021). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/4/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendants Lenovo (United States) Inc., and Motorola Mobility LLC to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to May 12, 2021 - filed by Lenovo (United States), Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by DigiMedia Tech, LLC. Motorola Mobility LLC served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by DigiMedia Tech, LLC. Lenovo (United States), Inc. served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (Attachments: #1 Summons)(nmg) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Brainbox Innovations, LLC for DigiMedia Tech, LLC filed by DigiMedia Tech, LLC. (nmg) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,473,532 B1; US 6,741,250 B1; US 6,744,818 B2; US 6,684,220 B1. (nmg) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Lenovo (United States), Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3530526.) - filed by DigiMedia Tech, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DigiMedia Tech, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MOTOROLA MOBILITY, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Lenovo Group is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rodger Dallery Smith, II