This case was last updated from PACER on 10/31/2020 at 22:48:22 (UTC).

Digi Portal LLC v. CoStar Realty Information, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/28/2020 Digi Portal LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against CoStar Realty Information, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00861

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Digi Portal LLC

Defendant

CoStar Realty Information, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jimmy C. Chong

Attorney at The Chong Law Firm, P.A.

2961 Centerville Road, Suite 350

Wilmington, DE 19808

David R. Bennett

Defendant Attorneys

Jeremy Douglas Anderson

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, P.C.

222 Delaware Avenue, 17Th Floor, P.O. Box 1114

Wilmington, DE 19899-1114

Indranil Mukerji

Raj Utreja

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal

#14

(#14) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s). (Attachments: #1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal)(mdb) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#13

(#13) SO ORDERED re #12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/15/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Digi Portal LLC as to CoStar Realty Information, Inc. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Complaint to September 18, 2020 - filed by CoStar Realty Information, Inc.. (Anderson, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Complaint to September 4, 2020 - filed by CoStar Realty Information, Inc.. (Anderson, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Indranil Mukerji and Raj Utreja - filed by CoStar Realty Information, Inc.. (Anderson, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

1 #13

Exhibit M

1 #12

Exhibit L

1 #11

Exhibit K

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s). (Attachments: #1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal)(mdb) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SO ORDERED re #12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/15/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Digi Portal LLC as to CoStar Realty Information, Inc. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to September 18, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: CoStar Realty Information, Inc. answer due 9/18/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/4/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Complaint to September 18, 2020 - filed by CoStar Realty Information, Inc.. (Anderson, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Complaint to September 4, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: CoStar Realty Information, Inc. answer due 9/4/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 8/21/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Complaint to September 4, 2020 - filed by CoStar Realty Information, Inc.. (Anderson, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Raj Utreja and Indranil Mukerji for CoStar Realty Information, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Indranil Mukerji and Raj Utreja filed by CoStar Realty Information, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/24/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Indranil Mukerji and Raj Utreja - filed by CoStar Realty Information, Inc.. (Anderson, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney David R. Bennett for Digi Portal LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00860-MN et al.(kmd) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David R. Bennett filed by Digi Portal LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/9/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David R. Bennett - filed by Digi Portal LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Digi Portal LLC. CoStar Realty Information, Inc. served on 7/1/2020, answer due 7/22/2020. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00860-MN through 1:20-cv-00864-MN and 1:20-cv-00880-MN (rjb) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (nmg) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Digi Portal LLC. (nmg) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,352,854 ;5,983,227 ;7,171,414 ;7,565,359 ;9,626,342. (nmg) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against CoStar Realty Information, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3023201.) - filed by Digi Portal LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 List of Related Cases)(nmg) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Digi Portal LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CoStar Realty Information Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Indranil Mukerji

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeremy Douglas Anderson