This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 08:09:36 (UTC).

Dieterle v. Insight Direct USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 Dieterle filed an Other lawsuit against Insight Direct USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Donna M. Ryu. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-MC-80293

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donna M. Ryu

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Alexander Dieterle

Respondents

Gorilla, Inc.

Insight Direct USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Jennifer Briggs Fisher

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

One Market Plaza, Suite 2200

San Francisco, CA 941051127

Respondent Attorney

Amber Alyne Eklof

Attorney at Gordon Rees

275 Battery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Amber Alyne Eklof (Eklof, Amber) (Filed on 12/23/2019) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

1 #3

Receipt

#2

(#2) Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying #1 Motion to Quash Without Prejudice. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2019) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

1 #1

Declaration

1 #2

Proposed Order

#1

(#1) NON-PARTY ALEXANDER DIETERLE'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA filed by Alexander Dieterle. Responses due by 12/31/2019. Replies due by 1/7/2020. Receipt $47.00 34611146453. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Receipt) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019). (Entered: 12/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Amber Alyne Eklof (Eklof, Amber) (Filed on 12/23/2019) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying #1 Motion to Quash Without Prejudice. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2019) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NON-PARTY ALEXANDER DIETERLE'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA filed by Alexander Dieterle. Responses due by 12/31/2019. Replies due by 1/7/2020. Receipt $47.00 34611146453. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Receipt) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019). (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.