This case was last updated from PACER on 12/19/2020 at 09:35:49 (UTC).

Didion Milling, Inc. v. Ply-Bond Chemicals and Mill Supplies, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 Didion Milling, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ply-Bond Chemicals and Mill Supplies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D. Peterson and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00966

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D. Peterson

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Didion Milling, Inc.

Defendant

Ply-Bond Chemicals and Mill Supplies, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

K. Scott Wagner

Attorney at Mallery & Zimmerman, S.C.

731 North Jackson Street, Suite 900

Milwaukee, WI 53202

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Didion Milling, Inc.. (Wagner, K.) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Ply-Bond Chemicals and Mill Supplies, Inc. (rks) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

1 #2

Summons Summons

1 #1

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2769279.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons) (Wagner, K.) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketAction Requested: Counsel for plaintiff requested to promptly file proof of service. (rks) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Didion Milling, Inc.. (Wagner, K.) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Ply-Bond Chemicals and Mill Supplies, Inc. (rks) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketStandard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (rks) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (rks) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2769279.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons) (Wagner, K.) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less