This case was last updated from PACER on 07/06/2019 at 07:33:48 (UTC).

Didier Consultants, Inc. v. Sasol Chemicals (USA), L.L.C.

Case Summary

On 05/07/2019 Didier Consultants, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Sasol Chemicals USA , L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr and John W. deGravelles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00284

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

Presiding Judge

John W. deGravelles

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Didier Consultants, Inc.

Defendants

Sasol (USA) Corporation

Sasol Chemicals (USA) LLC

Sasol Chemicals (USA) L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J. Mark Robinson

Attorney at Robinson Law Firm

412 North 4Th Street, Room 329

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) MOTION to Amend Scheduling Conference Order by Didier Consultants, Inc.. (Robinson, J.) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Didier Consultants, Inc.. All Plaintiffs. (Robinson, J.) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Sasol (USA) Corporation, Sasol Chemicals (USA) L.L.C.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LT) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

7 #2

Proposed Pleading; SUMMONS

7 #1

Exhibit

#7

(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Didier Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Pleading; SUMMONS)(Robinson, J.) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1653, on or before 5/28/2019, the plaintiff shall file an amended complaint providing the citizenship of defendant Sasol (USA)Corporation, by setting forth all citizenship particulars required to sustain federal diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/22/2019. (SGO) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Sasol Chemicals (USA) L.L.C.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Submitted (Robinson, J.) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#3

(#3) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 6/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/14/2019. (SGO) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Sasol (USA) Corporation, Sasol Chemicals (USA) L.L.C.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

1 #3

Attachment Summons

1 #2

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1938668.), filed by Didier Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment Summons)(Robinson, J.) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #10 Ex Parte Motion to Amend Scheduling Conference Order. The Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 is reset for 8/22/2019 at 4:00 p.m. A Status Report shall be filed on or before 8/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/25/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Conference Order. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Amend Scheduling Conference Order by Didier Consultants, Inc.. (Robinson, J.) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Didier Consultants, Inc.. All Plaintiffs. (Robinson, J.) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to Sasol (USA) Corporation, Sasol Chemicals (USA) L.L.C.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LT) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Didier Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Pleading; SUMMONS)(Robinson, J.) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1653, on or before 5/28/2019, the plaintiff shall file an amended complaint providing the citizenship of defendant Sasol (USA)Corporation, by setting forth all citizenship particulars required to sustain federal diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/22/2019. (SGO) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Sasol Chemicals (USA) L.L.C.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Submitted (Robinson, J.) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 6/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/14/2019. (SGO) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Sasol (USA) Corporation, Sasol Chemicals (USA) L.L.C.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1938668.), filed by Didier Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment Summons)(Robinson, J.) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.