This case was last updated from PACER on 04/03/2021 at 07:59:58 (UTC).

Dickinson v. The 1 Delivery Service, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 Dickinson filed an Other lawsuit against The 1 Delivery Service, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph C. Spero and Charles R. Breyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00813

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Joseph C. Spero

Charles R. Breyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scott Dickinson

Defendant

The 1 Delivery Service, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott Adam Edelsberg

Attorney at Edelsberg Law, PA

20900 Ne 30Th Avenue, Suite 417

Aventura, FL 33180

Joshua Moyer

Attorney at Shamis & Gentile, P.A.

401 W. A Street, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

Jamie Danielle Wells

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94111

David Carlyle Powell

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 3-15 filed by The 1 Delivery Service, Inc. (Wells, Jamie) (Filed on 3/19/2021) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by The 1 Delivery Service, Inc.. (Wells, Jamie) (Filed on 3/19/2021) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#14

(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Dickinson. The 1 Delivery Service, Inc. served on 2/5/2021, answer due 2/26/2021. (Moyer, Joshua) (Filed on 3/2/2021) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

#13

(#13) JOINT STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint [JOINT] filed by The 1 Delivery Service, Inc.. (Wells, Jamie) (Filed on 2/26/2021) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Danielle Wells for Defendant The 1 Delivery Services Inc. (Wells, Jamie) (Filed on 2/26/2021) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Moyer (Moyer, Joshua) (Filed on 2/9/2021) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#10

(#10) Summons Issued as to The 1 Delivery Service, Inc.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2021) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#9

(#9) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2021) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

7 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#7

(#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 2/3/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2021) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#5

(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scott Dickinson.. (Edelsberg, Scott) (Filed on 2/2/2021) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#4

(#4) Civil Cover Sheet filed by Scott Dickinson (Edelsberg, Scott) (Filed on 2/2/2021) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Edelsberg, Scott) (Filed on 2/2/2021) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE TELEPHONE CONSUMER PROTECTION ACT, 47 U.S.C. 227, ET SEQ. (TCPA); JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against The 1 Delivery Service, Inc., (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number 0971-15522412). Filed by Scott Dickinson. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Edelsberg, Scott) (Filed on 2/2/2021) Modified on 2/3/2021 (tnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/02/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 3-15 filed by The 1 Delivery Service, Inc. (Wells, Jamie) (Filed on 3/19/2021) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by The 1 Delivery Service, Inc.. (Wells, Jamie) (Filed on 3/19/2021) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Dickinson. The 1 Delivery Service, Inc. served on 2/5/2021, answer due 2/26/2021. (Moyer, Joshua) (Filed on 3/2/2021) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) JOINT STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint [JOINT] filed by The 1 Delivery Service, Inc.. (Wells, Jamie) (Filed on 2/26/2021) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Danielle Wells for Defendant The 1 Delivery Services Inc. (Wells, Jamie) (Filed on 2/26/2021) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Moyer (Moyer, Joshua) (Filed on 2/9/2021) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to The 1 Delivery Service, Inc.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2021) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2021) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/21/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2021 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2021) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 2/3/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2021) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2021) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scott Dickinson.. (Edelsberg, Scott) (Filed on 2/2/2021) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Civil Cover Sheet filed by Scott Dickinson (Edelsberg, Scott) (Filed on 2/2/2021) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Case has been randomly assigned to judge, however incorrect Civil Cover Sheet CAND 44 (Rev. 08/18) used at case opening. Please complete and re-file as a separate docket entry correct Civil Cover Sheet JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 10/20) re: #1 . #1 Complaint filed by Scott Dickinson (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2021) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/16/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2021) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Edelsberg, Scott) (Filed on 2/2/2021) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE TELEPHONE CONSUMER PROTECTION ACT, 47 U.S.C. 227, ET SEQ. (TCPA); JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against The 1 Delivery Service, Inc., (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number 0971-15522412). Filed by Scott Dickinson. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Edelsberg, Scott) (Filed on 2/2/2021) Modified on 2/3/2021 (tnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott Adam Edelsberg