This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/31/2020 at 09:35:20 (UTC).

Dickerson v. PLZ Aeroscience Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 09/01/2020 Dickerson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PLZ Aeroscience Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Clarence Cooper. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03618

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Clarence Cooper

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian Dickerson

Defendants and Cross Claimants

PLZ Aeroscience Corporation

Hazmat Emergency Response and Remediation, Inc.

Defendant and Cross Defendant

Hazmat Emergency Response and Remediation, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric Jonathan David Rogers

Attorney at Fried Goldberg LLC

3550 Lenox Road, N.E., Suite 1500

Atlanta, GA 30326

Michael L. Goldberg

Attorney at Fried Rogers Goldberg, LLC - Atl

Three Alliance Center, Suite 1500, 3550 Lenox Road, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30326-4302

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Ronald Scott Masterson

Attorney at Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP-GA

Suite 2900, 1180 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3521

Thomas B Ward

Attorney at Freeman Mathis & Gary

100 Galleria Parkway, Suite 1600

Atlanta, GA 30339

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Thomas B Ward

Attorney at Freeman Mathis & Gary

100 Galleria Parkway, Suite 1600

Atlanta, GA 30339

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

11 #1

Exhibit A

11 #2

Exhibit B

#12

#13

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #11 Crossclaim by Hazmat Emergency Response and Remediation, Inc..(Ward, Thomas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Hazmat Emergency Response and Remediation, Inc..(Ward, Thomas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Defendant PLZ Aeroscience ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT ( Discovery ends on 3/1/2021.), CROSSCLAIM against Hazmat Emergency Response and Remediation, Inc. by PLZ Aeroscience Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Masterson, Ronald) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Return of Service Executed by Brian Dickerson. Hazmat Emergency Response and Remediation, Inc. served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (Goldberg, Michael) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Electronic Summons Issued as to Hazmat Emergency Response and Remediation, Inc. (bjh) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE Of Filing Alias Summons - Hazmat Emergency Response and Remediation, Inc. by Brian Dickerson (Goldberg, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Return of Service Executed by Brian Dickerson. PLZ Aeroscience Corporation served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020. (Goldberg, Michael) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Return of Service Executed by Brian Dickerson. Hazmat Emergency Response and Remediation, Inc. served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020. (Goldberg, Michael) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/20. (eop) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to PLZ Aeroscience Corporation. (eop) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Brian Dickerson. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-10089774) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PLZ AEROSCIENCE CORPORATION A FOREIGN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael L. Goldberg