This case was last updated from PACER on 12/20/2020 at 09:08:59 (UTC).

Dickens v. Saul

Case Summary

On 10/21/2020 Dickens filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Graham Mullen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00581

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Graham Mullen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shatoya Dickens

Defendants

Andrew Saul

Andrew M. Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charlotte Williams Hall

Attorney at Arrowood and Hall, PLLC

Po Box 58129

Raleigh, NC 27658

 

Court Documents

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Shatoya Dickens. Andrew M. Saul served on 10/29/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Hall, Charlotte) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Andrew Saul, US Attorney and US Attorney General. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (tlj) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(tlj) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4722895), filed by Shatoya Dickens.(Hall, Charlotte) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less