This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/05/2021 at 07:57:51 (UTC).

Dick v. Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution et al

Case Summary

On 01/04/2021 Dick filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise J. Casper. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-10007

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Denise J. Casper

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ph.D. Henry J.B. Dick

Defendants

Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution

Kathi Benjamin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marc D. Freiberger

Attorney at Freiberger & Washienko, LLC

Suite 220, 311 Summer Street

Boston, MA 02210

Brendan T. Sweeney

Attorney at Freiberger & Washienko, LLC

211 Congress Street, Suite 720

Boston, MA 02110

Defendant Attorneys

Patrick M. Curran, Jr.

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

One Boston Place, Suite 3500

Boston, MA 02108

Christopher Land

Attorney at Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution

569 Woods Hole Road, Ms 14

Woods Hole, MA 02543

Lorenzo Rabajante Cabantog

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

One Boston Place, Suite 3500

Boston, MA 02108

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Marc D. Freiberger on behalf of Henry J.B. Dick (Freiberger, Marc) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

1 #33

Exhibit Exhibit J5

1 #32

Exhibit Exhibit J4

1 #30

Exhibit Exhibit J2

1 #29

Exhibit Exhibit J1

1 #28

Exhibit Exhibit I3

1 #27

Exhibit Exhibit I2

1 #23

Exhibit Exhibit G3

1 #22

Exhibit Exhibit G2

1 #21

Exhibit Exhibit G1

1 #20

Exhibit Exhibit F5

1 #19

Exhibit Exhibit F4

1 #18

Exhibit Exhibit F3

1 #17

Exhibit Exhibit F2

1 #16

Exhibit Exhibit F1

1 #15

Exhibit Exhibit E2

1 #14

Exhibit Exhibit E1

1 #13

Exhibit Exhibit D3

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan T. Sweeney on behalf of Henry J.B. Dick (Sweeney, Brendan) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Henry J.B. Dick. Kathi Benjamin waiver sent on 1/6/2021, answer due 3/8/2021. (Freiberger, Marc) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Henry J.B. Dick. Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution waiver sent on 1/6/2021, answer due 3/8/2021. (Freiberger, Marc) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Lorenzo Rabajante Cabantog on behalf of Kathi Benjamin, Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution (Cabantog, Lorenzo) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Land on behalf of Kathi Benjamin, Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution (Land, Christopher) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • Docket(#6) Document/Entry filed in duplicate. Please see D. #5 for correct Notice of Appearance for counsel Patrick M. Curran, Jr. (Currie, Haley) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Curran, Jr on behalf of Kathi Benjamin, Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution (Curran, Patrick) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Halley, Taylor) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Marc D. Freiberger on behalf of Henry J.B. Dick (Freiberger, Marc) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8576174 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Henry J.B. Dick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Local Category Form, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B1, #7 Exhibit Exhibit C1, #8 Exhibit Exhibit C2, #9 Exhibit Exhibit C3, #10 Exhibit Exhibit C4, #11 Exhibit Exhibit D1, #12 Exhibit Exhibit D2, #13 Exhibit Exhibit D3, #14 Exhibit Exhibit E1, #15 Exhibit Exhibit E2, #16 Exhibit Exhibit F1, #17 Exhibit Exhibit F2, #18 Exhibit Exhibit F3, #19 Exhibit Exhibit F4, #20 Exhibit Exhibit F5, #21 Exhibit Exhibit G1, #22 Exhibit Exhibit G2, #23 Exhibit Exhibit G3, #24 Exhibit Exhibit H1, #25 Exhibit Exhibit H2, #26 Exhibit Exhibit I1, #27 Exhibit Exhibit I2, #28 Exhibit Exhibit I3, #29 Exhibit Exhibit J1, #30 Exhibit Exhibit J2, #31 Exhibit Exhibit J3, #32 Exhibit Exhibit J4, #33 Exhibit Exhibit J5, #34 Exhibit Exhibit J6, #35 Exhibit Exhibit K1)(Freiberger, Marc) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution is a litigant