This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2021 at 09:05:17 (UTC).

Dick v. Wilson et al (INMATE 1)

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 Dick filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Wilson INMATE 1. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen Michael Doyle and W. Harold Albritton, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00353

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stephen Michael Doyle

Presiding Judge

W. Harold Albritton, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jonathan Grant Dick

Union Springs, AL 36089-5107

Defendants

B. Wilson

Wexford Health Sources, Inc.

Daniel Gay

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Philip Piggott

Attorney at Webster Henry Bradwell Cohan Speagle & DeShazo PC

2 Perimeter Park South; Suite 445 East

Birmingham, AL 35243

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER ON MOTION: it is ORDERED that the #13 motion to file special report and supporting evidentiary materials under seal is GRANTED for the purpose of protecting such documents and records from uses that are outside of the scope of Dft Wexford's defenses in this case; Upon filing, the Clerk is DIRECTED to place under SEAL Dft Wexfprd's special report, including any and all attachments to said report; further ORDERED that any confidential information produced, disclosed, exchanged, or used in this action as specifically described above shall be treated as confidential and access to the same shall be available or utilized solely in connection with the above-captioned action by and between the court, court personnel, the parties and, if represented, the attorney(s) of record. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 6/15/2021. (bes, ) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#13

(#13) MOTION to File Special Report Under Seal by Wexford Health Sources, Inc.. (Piggott, Philip) Modified on 6/15/2021 to clarify the docket text (bes, ). (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#12

(#12) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Wexford Health Sources, Inc.. (Piggott, Philip) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

10 #1

Exhibit A

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wexford Health Sources, Inc.. Wexford Health Sources, Inc. waiver sent on 6/15/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Piggott, Philip) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#9

(#9) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint and #6 Order signed by illegible for Wexford Health Sources, Inc. served on 6/10/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. (bes, ) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

#8

(#8) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint and #6 Order signed by O. Hicks for B. Wilson served on 6/9/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. (bes, ) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#7

(#7) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint and #6 Order signed by O. Hicks for Daniel Gay served on 6/9/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. (bes, ) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT AND ANSWER on or before 7/19/2021; The CLERK is also DIRECTED to (1) send a copy of this Order to Plf; (2) provide a copy of this Order and the Complaint to ALDOC General Counsel and to counsel for Wexford Health Sources, Inc., and (3) serve a copy of this Order and the Complaint via certified mail on the Dfts. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 6/7/2021. (bes, ) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER ON MOTION granting #4 Motion Pay Initial Partial Filing Fee When Funds Available; further ORDERED that such portion of the #3 order requiring payment of an initial partial filing fee is VACATED. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 6/7/2021. (bes, ) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

4 #1

Exhibit 1

#4

(#4) MOTION to Pay Initial Partial Filing Fee When Funds Available by Jonathan Grant Dick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(bes, ) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

#3

(#3) (VACATED PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S #5 ORDER) ORDER ON MOTION directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $7.67 be paid on or before 6/8/2021; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Bullock CF. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 5/19/2021. (Furn: Cashier) (bes, ) Modified on 6/7/2021 (bes, ). (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#2

(#2) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Jonathan Grant Dick. (hrs, ) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#1

(#1) Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Daniel Gay, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., B. Wilson, filed by Jonathan Grant Dick.(hrs, ) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SEALED DOCUMENT - Special Report to Inmate 1983 Complaint by Wexford Health Sources, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a, #2 Exhibit a-1, #3 Exhibit a-2, #4 Exhibit a-3)(bes, ) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER ON MOTION: it is ORDERED that the #13 motion to file special report and supporting evidentiary materials under seal is GRANTED for the purpose of protecting such documents and records from uses that are outside of the scope of Dft Wexford's defenses in this case; Upon filing, the Clerk is DIRECTED to place under SEAL Dft Wexfprd's special report, including any and all attachments to said report; further ORDERED that any confidential information produced, disclosed, exchanged, or used in this action as specifically described above shall be treated as confidential and access to the same shall be available or utilized solely in connection with the above-captioned action by and between the court, court personnel, the parties and, if represented, the attorney(s) of record. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 6/15/2021. (bes, ) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketAO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for (DFT) Wexford Health Sources, Inc.. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, ) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to File Special Report Under Seal by Wexford Health Sources, Inc.. (Piggott, Philip) Modified on 6/15/2021 to clarify the docket text (bes, ). (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Wexford Health Sources, Inc.. (Piggott, Philip) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint by Wexford Health Sources, Inc..(Piggott, Philip) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wexford Health Sources, Inc.. Wexford Health Sources, Inc. waiver sent on 6/15/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Piggott, Philip) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint and #6 Order signed by illegible for Wexford Health Sources, Inc. served on 6/10/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. (bes, ) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint and #6 Order signed by O. Hicks for B. Wilson served on 6/9/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. (bes, ) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint and #6 Order signed by O. Hicks for Daniel Gay served on 6/9/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. (bes, ) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT AND ANSWER on or before 7/19/2021; The CLERK is also DIRECTED to (1) send a copy of this Order to Plf; (2) provide a copy of this Order and the Complaint to ALDOC General Counsel and to counsel for Wexford Health Sources, Inc., and (3) serve a copy of this Order and the Complaint via certified mail on the Dfts. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 6/7/2021. (bes, ) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER ON MOTION granting #4 Motion Pay Initial Partial Filing Fee When Funds Available; further ORDERED that such portion of the #3 order requiring payment of an initial partial filing fee is VACATED. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 6/7/2021. (bes, ) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Pay Initial Partial Filing Fee When Funds Available by Jonathan Grant Dick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(bes, ) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) (VACATED PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S #5 ORDER) ORDER ON MOTION directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $7.67 be paid on or before 6/8/2021; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Bullock CF. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 5/19/2021. (Furn: Cashier) (bes, ) Modified on 6/7/2021 (bes, ). (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Jonathan Grant Dick. (hrs, ) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Daniel Gay, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., B. Wilson, filed by Jonathan Grant Dick.(hrs, ) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wexford Health Soures Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Philip Piggott