This case was last updated from PACER on 12/05/2019 at 05:46:32 (UTC).

DiCarlo v. Director, TDCJ-CID

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 a Prisoner - Other Prisoner case was filed by DiCarlo against Director, TDCJ-CID in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04720

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vanessa D Gilmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Martin Dominick DiCarlo

Huntsville, TX 77343

Defendant

Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Edward Larry Marshall

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

Po Box 12548

Austin, TX 78711

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Filed documents RETURNED by Petitioner by Martin Dominick DiCarlo, filed.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#8

(#8) FINAL JUDGMENT. Case terminated on 12/17/2019(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM AND OPINION granting #1 Motion for Leave to proceed as a pauper. Any remaining pending motions are Denied as moot. Certificate of Appealability is Denied(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (SarahShelby, 4) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

5 #1

*Restricted*

#5

(#5) Case transferred in from Texas Eastern. Case Number 9:19-cv-00141; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF TRANSFER. The Clerk will TRANSFER this action to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 11/6/19. (ljw, ) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#3

(#3) MEMORANDUM ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 11/6/19. (ljw, ) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#2

(#2) Request for status of case by Martin Dominick DiCarlo. (mailed docket sheet on 10/1/19) (ljw, ) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Martin Dominick DiCarlo.(ljw, ) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed documents RETURNED by Petitioner by Martin Dominick DiCarlo, filed.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FINAL JUDGMENT. Case terminated on 12/17/2019(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM AND OPINION granting #1 Motion for Leave to proceed as a pauper. Any remaining pending motions are Denied as moot. Certificate of Appealability is Denied(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (SarahShelby, 4) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case transferred in from Texas Eastern. Case Number 9:19-cv-00141; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • Interdistrict transfer to the Southern District of Texas Houston Division. (ljw, ) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER OF TRANSFER. The Clerk will TRANSFER this action to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 11/6/19. (ljw, ) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MEMORANDUM ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 11/6/19. (ljw, ) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for status of case by Martin Dominick DiCarlo. (mailed docket sheet on 10/1/19) (ljw, ) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (ljw, ) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Martin Dominick DiCarlo.(ljw, ) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.