This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/18/2021 at 09:10:43 (UTC).

DiCaprio et al v. AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 DiCaprio filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Bruce E. Reinhart and Robin L. Rosenberg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:21-CV-80579

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Bruce E. Reinhart

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elizabeth DiCaprio

Defendants

Chattem Inc.

Sanofi S.A.

GlaxoSmithKline LLC

Sanofi US Services Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation

Pfizer, Inc.

Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC

Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC

Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V.

Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc.

Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC

Cardinal Health, Inc.

GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation

Walgreen Co.

Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC

Duane Reade, Inc.

McKesson Corp.

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brent R. Bigger

Eric Daniel Roslansky

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Chattem Inc., Duane Reade, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Glaxosmithkline PLC, McKesson Corp., Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreen Co.. (cds) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

 

Docket Entries

03/29/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2021

Docket(#4) MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-80579-RLR with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2021

DocketCases associated 9:20-md-2924-RLR. (mc) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Chattem Inc., Duane Reade, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Glaxosmithkline PLC, McKesson Corp., Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreen Co.. (cds) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2021

Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14538456, filed by Joseph DiCaprio, Elizabeth DiCaprio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Amerisource Bergen, #3 Summon(s) AP LLC, #4 Summon(s) APNY LLC, #5 Summon(s) BI International GMBH, #6 Summon(s) BIC USA, #7 Summon(s) BIC, #8 Summon(s) BIP Inc., #9 Summon(s) BIP, #10 Summon(s) Cardinal Health, #11 Summon(s) Chattem, #12 Summon(s) Duane Reade, #13 Summon(s) GSK America, #14 Summon(s) GSK PLC, #15 Summon(s) GSK PLC, #16 Summon(s) McKesson, #17 Summon(s) Patheon, #18 Summon(s) Pfizer, #19 Summon(s) SA U.S. LLC, #20 Summon(s) Sanofi S.A., #21 Summon(s) Sanofi US Services, #22 Summon(s) Walgreens Co., #23 Summon(s) WBA)(Bigger, Brent) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less