This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/13/2022 at 07:58:57 (UTC).

Diaz v. Radius Global Solutions, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 Diaz filed an Other lawsuit against Radius Global Solutions, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are M. James Lorenz and Jill L. Burkhardt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00038

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M. James Lorenz

Referral Judge

Jill L. Burkhardt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ismael Diaz

Defendants

Radius Global Solutions, LLC

American Express National Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ahren A. Tiller

Attorney at BLC Law Center, APC

1230 Columbia Street, Suite 1100

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

Brittany Lyn Shaw

Attorney at Lawyers for Justice, PC

410 Arden Avenue, Suite 203

Glendale, CA 91203

Kenneth Akira Ohashi

Attorney at Sessions Israel & Shartle, LLP

1550 Hotel Circle North, Suite 260

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion to withdraw Brittany L. Shaw's as counsel for Defendant Radius Global Solutions, LLC. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/08/2022. (jpp) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

7 #1

Proof of Service

7 #7

Main Document

6 #1

Proof of Service

6 #6

Main Document

5 #1

Proof of Service

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #3 Joint Motion to respond to complaint to 2/18/2022. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 2/04/2022. (jpp) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

3 #1

Proof of Service

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jms)(jrd) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion to withdraw Brittany L. Shaw's as counsel for Defendant Radius Global Solutions, LLC. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/08/2022. (jpp) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Withdraw Brittany L. Shaw as Attorney for Defendant Radius Global Solutions by Radius Global Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Ohashi, Kenneth)Attorney Kenneth Akira Ohashi added to party Radius Global Solutions, LLC(pty:dft) (jpp). (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Radius Global Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent NGI Acquisition LLC for Radius Global Solutions, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Shaw, Brittany) (jpp). (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Radius Global Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Shaw, Brittany) (jpp). (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #3 Joint Motion to respond to complaint to 2/18/2022. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 2/04/2022. (jpp) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Radius Global Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Shaw, Brittany)Attorney Brittany Lyn Shaw added to party Radius Global Solutions, LLC(pty:dft) (jpp). (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jms)(jrd) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against Radius Global Solutions, LLC, American Express National Bank (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number ACASDC-16475143), filed by Ismael Diaz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:22-cv-38-L-JLB. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Tiller, Ahren)(jms)(jrd) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Radius Global Solutions LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS AMEX BANK is a litigant