This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/05/2020 at 09:48:33 (UTC).

DIAZ v. OBERLANDER et al

Case Summary

On 08/06/2020 DIAZ filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against OBERLANDER. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard A. Lanzillo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00222

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard A. Lanzillo

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DOMINIC SOUTO DIAZ

Marienville, PA 16239

Respondents

ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA

DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF ERIE

OBERLANDER

 

Court Documents

10 #5

Exhibit 5

10 #4

Exhibit 4

10 #3

Exhibit 3

10 #2

Exhibit 2

10 #1

Exhibit 1

#10

(#10) Amended PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by DOMINIC SOUTO DIAZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (sdp) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER denying #7 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 9/25/2020. (dm) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

7 #1

Envelope

#7

(#7) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by DOMINIC SOUTO DIAZ. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (sdp) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

6 #1

Envelope

#6

(#6) MOTION to Amend #4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by DOMINIC SOUTO DIAZ. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (sdp) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

5 #6

Envelope

5 #2

Exhibit 2

5 #1

Exhibit 1

#5

(#5) BRIEF in Support of #4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by DOMINIC SOUTO DIAZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Envelope) (sdp) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

4 #2

Exhibit 2

4 #1

Exhibit 1

#4

(#4) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5, receipt number 24668064210), filed by DOMINIC SOUTO DIAZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (sdp) Modified on 8/27/2020 (sdp). (Entered: 08/27/2020)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Amended PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by DOMINIC SOUTO DIAZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (sdp) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER denying #7 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 9/25/2020. (dm) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #6 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend. The Clerk is directed to file the document at ECF No. 5 and the attached exhibits as the Amended Petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 9/25/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jdg) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by DOMINIC SOUTO DIAZ. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (sdp) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Amend #4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by DOMINIC SOUTO DIAZ. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (sdp) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) BRIEF in Support of #4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by DOMINIC SOUTO DIAZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Envelope) (sdp) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER DIRECTING that the Clerk file the petition. It is further ordered that the United States Marshal shall make service of this order, together with a copy of the petition, upon the respondents by certified mail, costs to be advanced by the United States. Within 21 days of service of this order, respondent and the District Attorney shall respond to the allegations of the petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The District Attorney shall furnish this court with the state court records. The parties are allowed 14 days from this date to appeal this order to a District Judge pursuant to Local Rule 72(C)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 8/24/2020. (dm) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5, receipt number 24668064210), filed by DOMINIC SOUTO DIAZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (sdp) Modified on 8/27/2020 (sdp). (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filing fee: $5, receipt number 24668064210 (elt) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus LODGED. NO FEE OR IFP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Letter to Court, #4 Envelope) (sdp) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OBERLANDER is a litigant