This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/03/2021 at 08:49:45 (UTC).

Diaz v. Coherent, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/04/2021 Diaz filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Coherent, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John G. Koeltl. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03990

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John G. Koeltl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Greydy Diaz

Defendants

II-VI Incorporated

Beverly Kay Matthews

Watson Merger Sub Inc.

Garry Rogerson

Coherent, Inc.

Jay T. Flatley

Sandeep Vij

Michael McMullen

Andy Mattes

Pamela Fletcher

Steve Skaggs

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gina M. Serra

Attorney at Rigrodsky Law, P.A.

825 East Gate Boulevard, Suite 300

Garden City, NY 11530

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), plaintiff hereby voluntarily dismisses the above-captioned action (the "Action"). Defendants have filed neither an answer nor a motion for summary judgment in the Action. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/24/2021) (mml) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Coherent, Inc., Jay T. Flatley, Pamela Fletcher, II-VI Incorporated, Andy Mattes, Beverly Kay Matthews, Michael McMullen, Garry Rogerson, Steve Skaggs, Sandeep Vij, Watson Merger Sub Inc.. Document filed by Greydy Diaz. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Serra, Gina) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

#5

(#5) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21-cv-03775. Document filed by Greydy Diaz..(Serra, Gina) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

#4

(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Serra, Gina) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

#3

(#3) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:21-cv-03775-JGK. Document filed by Greydy Diaz..(Serra, Gina) Modified on 5/5/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 05/04/2021)

#2

(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Serra, Gina) Modified on 5/5/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 05/04/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Coherent, Inc., Jay T. Flatley, Pamela Fletcher, II-VI Incorporated, Andy Mattes, Beverly Kay Matthews, Michael McMullen, Garry Rogerson, Steve Skaggs, Sandeep Vij, Watson Merger Sub Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24493913)Document filed by Greydy Diaz..(Serra, Gina) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), plaintiff hereby voluntarily dismisses the above-captioned action (the "Action"). Defendants have filed neither an answer nor a motion for summary judgment in the Action. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/24/2021) (mml) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Coherent, Inc., Jay T. Flatley, Pamela Fletcher, II-VI Incorporated, Andy Mattes, Beverly Kay Matthews, Michael McMullen, Garry Rogerson, Steve Skaggs, Sandeep Vij, Watson Merger Sub Inc.. Document filed by Greydy Diaz. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Serra, Gina) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Pretrial Conference set for 6/28/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John G. Koeltl. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-03775-JGK. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21-cv-03775. Document filed by Greydy Diaz..(Serra, Gina) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Serra, Gina) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge John G. Koeltl as possibly related to 21-cv-3775. (jgo) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Gina M. Serra to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the related case statement is not correct;. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (jgo) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Gina M. Serra to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:21-cv-03775-JGK. Document filed by Greydy Diaz..(Serra, Gina) Modified on 5/5/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Serra, Gina) Modified on 5/5/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Coherent, Inc., Jay T. Flatley, Pamela Fletcher, II-VI Incorporated, Andy Mattes, Beverly Kay Matthews, Michael McMullen, Garry Rogerson, Steve Skaggs, Sandeep Vij, Watson Merger Sub Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24493913)Document filed by Greydy Diaz..(Serra, Gina) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Coherent, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where II-VI INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gina M. Serra