This case was last updated from PACER on 02/13/2021 at 12:54:20 (UTC).

DIAZ et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al

Case Summary

On 12/15/2020 DIAZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN M. GALLAGHER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-06305

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN M. GALLAGHER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SU-LIN DIAZ

LUIS A CORREDOR

Defendants

ANGELINA AMATO

ADRIAN ANDRESI

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARC SETH ROSENBERG

Attorney at MAMMUTH & ROSENBERG

401 City Line Avenue, Suite 122

Bala Cynwyd, PA 19004-1122

Defendant Attorneys

LAUREN E. DEBRUICKER

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

615 Chestnut Street, Suite 1250

Philadelphia, PA 19106

ERIN E. LINDGREN

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEY OFFICE

615 Chestnut Street, Suite 1250

Philadelphia, PA 19106

 

Court Documents

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ANGELINA AMATO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ADRIAN ANDRESI ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14782808.), filed by SU-LIN DIAZ, LUIS A. CORREDOR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(ROSENBERG, MARC) Modified on 12/16/2020 (tjd). (Entered: 12/15/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PURSUANT TO THE CERTIFICATION ATTACHED AS EXHIBIT A, THE UNITED STATES IS SUBSTITUTED AS DEFENDANT IN COUNT I FOR DEFENDANT ADRIAN ANDRESI PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2679(B), (C), AND (D) OF THE FEDERAL TORT CLAIMS ACT; ALL CLAIMS AGAINST ADRIAN ANDRESI ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AND HE IS TERMINATED AS A DEFENDANT IN THIS ACTION; ALL CLAIMS AGAINST ANGELINA AMATO ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AND SHE IS TERMINATED AS A DEFENDANT IN THIS ACTION; AND COUNTS II, III, AND IV ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. THE PARTIES FURTHER STIPULATE, SUBJECT TO THE COURTS APPROVAL, THAT THE TIME FOR DEFENDANT THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT BE EXTENDED BY THIRTY (30) DAYS, THROUGH AND INCLUDING MARCH 15, 2021. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 2/10/21. 2/10/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) Modified on 2/12/2021 (tjd). (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by ERIN E. LINDGREN on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA with Certificate of Service(LINDGREN, ERIN) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN E. DEBRUICKER on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA with Certificate of Service(DEBRUICKER, LAUREN) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney, Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (kw, ) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to ANGELINA AMATO, ADRIAN ANDRESI, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 12/16/2020. SUMMONS E-MAILED TO AUSA ON 12/16/2020. (bw, ) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by LUIS A CORREDOR, SU-LIN DIAZ. (tjd) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ANGELINA AMATO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ADRIAN ANDRESI ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14782808.), filed by SU-LIN DIAZ, LUIS A. CORREDOR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(ROSENBERG, MARC) Modified on 12/16/2020 (tjd). (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAUREN E. DEBRUICKER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erin E. Lindgren Esq.