This case was last updated from PACER on 12/07/2021 at 08:37:20 (UTC).

Diaz Cuellar v. Santiago Abrams et al

Case Summary

On 10/08/2021 Diaz Cuellar filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Santiago Abrams. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kevin R. Sweazea, Gregory B. Wormuth and Kea W. Riggs. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00986

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gregory B. Wormuth

Presiding Judges

Kevin R. Sweazea

Kea W. Riggs

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yismary Diaz Cuellar

Defendants

Alexis Santiago Abrams

Rowdy Transport LLC doing business as Rowdy Resources, a foreign profit corporation

Hudson Insurance Group

Redpoint County Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David M Houliston

Attorney at The Law Offices of David M Houliston

7500 Jefferson Street Ne, Suite 106

Albuquerque, NM 87109

Defendant Attorneys

Seth Sparks

Attorney at Rodey, Dickason, Sloan, Akin & Robb

Po Box 1888

Albuquerque, NM 87103-1888

Lauren T Kedge

Attorney at Rodey Dickason Sloan Akin & Robb PA

201 Third St Nw, Ste 2200

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Alison R. Christian

Attorney at Christian Dichter & Sluga, PC

2800 North Central Avenue, Suite 860

Phoenix, AZ 85004

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Joint Status Report due 1/11/2022. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/25/2022 at 2:00 PM. Parties shall call Judge Wormuth's teleconference line at (877) 402-9753, access code 7578461, to be connected to the proceedings. (emm) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#28

(#28) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS AND BIFURCATE CLAIMS by District Judge Kea W. Riggs. Defendants' #6 Motion to Dismiss Claims against Defendant Hudson and to Bifurcate Claims against Defendant Redpoint is GRANTED. The claims against Defendant Hudson Insurance Group are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The claims against Defendant Redpoint are BIFURCATED and STAYED. Defendants' #25 Motion for Extension of Time to Reply is GRANTED. (ve) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#27

(#27) NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Hudson Insurance Group, Redpoint County Mutual Insurance Company re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Defendant Hudson and to Bifurcate Claims Against Defendant Redpoint filed by Redpoint County Mutual Insurance Company, Hudson Insurance Group (Christian, Alison) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

26 #3

Exhibit C: email exchange

26 #2

Exhibit B: Affidavit

#25

(#25) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss Claims against Defendant Hudson and to Bifurcate Claims against Defendant Redpoint by Hudson Insurance Group, Redpoint County Mutual Insurance Company. (Christian, Alison) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#24

(#24) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Defendant Hudson and to Bifurcate Claims Against Defendant Redpoint filed by Yismary Diaz Cuellar. (Houliston, David) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#21

(#21) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting #20 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Response to #6 Motion to Dismiss due by Novemer 2, 2021. (atc) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#6

(#20) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Defendant Hudson and to Bifurcate Claims Against Defendant Redpoint by Yismary Diaz Cuellar. (Houliston, David) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hudson Insurance Group, Redpoint County Mutual Insurance Company (Christian, Alison) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Hudson Insurance Group, Redpoint County Mutual Insurance Company. (Christian, Alison) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

#3

(#3) ***FILED IN ERROR*** Report (jg) Modified on 10/12/2021 (jg). (Entered: 10/12/2021)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Joint Status Report due 1/11/2022. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/25/2022 at 2:00 PM. Parties shall call Judge Wormuth's teleconference line at (877) 402-9753, access code 7578461, to be connected to the proceedings. (emm) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS AND BIFURCATE CLAIMS by District Judge Kea W. Riggs. Defendants' #6 Motion to Dismiss Claims against Defendant Hudson and to Bifurcate Claims against Defendant Redpoint is GRANTED. The claims against Defendant Hudson Insurance Group are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The claims against Defendant Redpoint are BIFURCATED and STAYED. Defendants' #25 Motion for Extension of Time to Reply is GRANTED. (ve) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Hudson Insurance Group, Redpoint County Mutual Insurance Company re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Defendant Hudson and to Bifurcate Claims Against Defendant Redpoint filed by Redpoint County Mutual Insurance Company, Hudson Insurance Group (Christian, Alison) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Defendant Hudson and to Bifurcate Claims Against Defendant Redpoint filed by Hudson Insurance Group, Redpoint County Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: prop Order, #2 Exhibit B: Affidavit, #3 Exhibit C: email exchange) (Christian, Alison) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss Claims against Defendant Hudson and to Bifurcate Claims against Defendant Redpoint by Hudson Insurance Group, Redpoint County Mutual Insurance Company. (Christian, Alison) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Defendant Hudson and to Bifurcate Claims Against Defendant Redpoint filed by Yismary Diaz Cuellar. (Houliston, David) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 16, 17 and 19. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • Docket(#22) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Kea W. Riggs as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting #20 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Response to #6 Motion to Dismiss due by Novemer 2, 2021. (atc) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Defendant Hudson and to Bifurcate Claims Against Defendant Redpoint by Yismary Diaz Cuellar. (Houliston, David) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Rowdy Transport LLC. (Kedge, Lauren) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Defendant Hudson and to Bifurcate Claims Against Defendant Redpoint by Hudson Insurance Group, Redpoint County Mutual Insurance Company. (Christian, Alison) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hudson Insurance Group, Redpoint County Mutual Insurance Company (Christian, Alison) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Hudson Insurance Group, Redpoint County Mutual Insurance Company. (Christian, Alison) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ***FILED IN ERROR*** Report (jg) Modified on 10/12/2021 (jg). (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (jg) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketOffice code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7932916 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Rowdy Transport LLC,D/B/A Rowdy Resources, Redpoint County Mutual Insurance Company, Hudson Insurance Group, Alexis Santiago Abrams (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kedge, Lauren) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Fifth Judicial, case number D-506-CV-2021-00815. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Kedge, Lauren) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Redpoint County Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Hudson Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Seth Sparks