This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/26/2021 at 07:54:41 (UTC).

Diatek Licensing LLC v. NFL Enterprises LLC

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 Diatek Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against NFL Enterprises LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John P. Cronan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-07241

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John P. Cronan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diatek Licensing LLC

Defendant

NFL Enterprises LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cortney Alexander

Attorney at Kent & Risley LLC

5755 N Point Pkwy, Ste 57

Alpharetta, GA 30022

Defendant Attorneys

Hilary Lovett Preston

Attorney at Vinson & Elkins

2801 Via Fortuna, Suite 100

Austin, TX 78746

Parker Douglas Hancock

Attorney at Vinson & Elkins

1001 Fannin St., Ste 2600

Houston, TX 77008

 

Court Documents

#19

#18

#17

#15

13 #3

Text of Proposed Order

13 #2

Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing

13 #1

Affidavit Declaration of Parker D. Hancock In Support of Motion for Admission Pr

13 #13

Main Document

#12

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Exhibit D - Claim Chart for the '828 Patent

1 #3

Exhibit C - Claim Chart for the '752 Patent

1 #2

Exhibit B - US Patent No. 8,195,828

1 #1

Exhibit A - US Patent No. 7,079,752

1 #1

Main Document

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE TERMINATED - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 10/15/2021 in a court action filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).(dt) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) NFL Enterprises LLC. Document filed by Diatek Licensing LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Alexander, Cortney) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: NFL Enterprises LLC answer due 11/4/2021. (jca) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #15 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Hilary L. Preston dated September 14, 2021. Defendant shall answer, or otherwise respond to, the Complaint by November 4, 2021. Defendant's request to adjourn the October 27, 2021, initial pretrial conference is denied. Defendant shall appear for the initial pretrial conference scheduled for October 27, 2021 at 4:00 p.m. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 9/17/2021) (jca) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Cortney Scott Alexander to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge John P. Cronan)(Text Only Order) (mhe) (Entered: 09/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Hilary L. Preston dated September 14, 2021. Document filed by NFL Enterprises LLC..(Preston, Hilary) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Parker D. Hancock to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge John P. Cronan)(Text Only Order) (mhe) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for Parker D. Hancock to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25032859. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Parker D. Hancock to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25032859. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by NFL Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Parker D. Hancock In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Hancock, Parker) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: The Court notes that it will hold IPTCs for related cases from 3:00 to 4:30 p.m. which counsel may attend if interested. Unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will conduct all IPTCs by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/27/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge John P. Cronan. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 9/2/2021) (jca) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Cortney Scott Alexander to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24993251. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Cortney Scott Alexander to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24993251. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Diatek Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Cortney S. Alexander, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Alexander, Cortney) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Diatek Licensing LLC..(Alexander, Cortney) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:21-cv-06457. Document filed by Diatek Licensing LLC..(Alexander, Cortney) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NFL Enterprises LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Diatek Licensing LLC..(Alexander, Cortney) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Alexander, Cortney) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Alexander, Cortney) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against NFL Enterprises LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24993156)Document filed by Diatek Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent No. 7,079,752, #2 Exhibit B - US Patent No. 8,195,828, #3 Exhibit C - Claim Chart for the '752 Patent, #4 Exhibit D - Claim Chart for the '828 Patent).(Alexander, Cortney) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Diatek Licensing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where NFL ENTERPRISES LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hilary Preston

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Parker Douglas Hancock