This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/26/2021 at 07:52:30 (UTC).

Diatek Licensing LLC v. AMC Networks Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 Diatek Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against AMC Networks Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John P. Cronan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-07238

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John P. Cronan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diatek Licensing LLC

Defendant

AMC Networks Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cortney Alexander

Attorney at Kent & Risley LLC

5755 N Point Pkwy, Ste 57

Alpharetta, GA 30022

 

Court Documents

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

6 #3

Text of Proposed Order

6 #2

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

6 #1

Affidavit of Cortney S. Alexander

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Exhibit D - Claim Chart for the '828 Patent

1 #3

Exhibit C - Claim Chart for the '752 Patent

1 #2

Exhibit B - US Patent No. 8,195,828

1 #1

Exhibit A - US Patent No. 7,079,752

1 #1

Main Document

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE TERMINATED - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 9/3/2021 in a court action filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).(km) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) AMC Networks Inc.. Document filed by Diatek Licensing LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Alexander, Cortney) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT:The Court notes that it will hold IPTCs for related cases from 3:00 to 4:30 p.m. which counsel may attend if interested. Unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will conduct all IPTCs by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/27/2021 at 04:15 PM before Judge John P. Cronan. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 9/2/2021) (jca) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John P. Cronan. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-06457-JPC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. AMC Networks Inc. served on 8/30/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent. Document filed by Diatek Licensing LLC..(Alexander, Cortney) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMC Networks Inc...(pc) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(pc) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge John P. Cronan as possibly related to 21cv6457. (pc) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Cortney Scott Alexander to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24992942. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:21-cv-06457. Document filed by Diatek Licensing LLC..(Alexander, Cortney) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Cortney Scott Alexander to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24992942. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Diatek Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Cortney S. Alexander, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Alexander, Cortney) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Diatek Licensing LLC..(Alexander, Cortney) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AMC Networks Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Diatek Licensing LLC..(Alexander, Cortney) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Alexander, Cortney) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Alexander, Cortney) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AMC Networks Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24992841)Document filed by Diatek Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent No. 7,079,752, #2 Exhibit B - US Patent No. 8,195,828, #3 Exhibit C - Claim Chart for the '752 Patent, #4 Exhibit D - Claim Chart for the '828 Patent).(Alexander, Cortney) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Diatek Licensing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AMC NETWORKS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cortney Alexander