This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 17:27:14 (UTC).

Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC et al v. Pandora Marketing, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 Diamond Resorts U S Collection Development, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Pandora Marketing, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Kronstadt, Patricia Donahue, Autumn D. Spaeth and Dale S. Fischer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03048

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

John A. Kronstadt

Dale S. Fischer

Referral Judges

Patricia Donahue

Autumn D. Spaeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC

Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC

Defendants

Esq. Miranda McCroskey

Pandora Marketing, LLC doing business as Timeshare Compliance

Del Mar Law Group

McCroskey Legal

Esq. J.L. Sean Slattery

Carlsbad Law Group

Slattery, Sobel & Decamp

Unlock Legal, APLC

Intermarketing Media, LLC doing business as Resort Advisory Group

Interested Party

O'Grady Law Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Emily B. Thomas

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

811 Main Street, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77002-6111

Emily B Thomas

Attorney at Baker and Hostetler LLP

811 Main Street Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77002

Elizabeth Marie Treckler

Attorney at Baker and Hostetler LLP

11601 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90025-0509

Jonathan D Blum

Attorney at Kolesar and Leatham

400 South Rampart Boulevard Suite 400

Las Vegas, NV 89145

Carrie Dettmer Slye

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

312 Walnut Street, Suite 3200

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Interested Party Attorney

William J O'Grady

Attorney at O'Grady Law Group

1980 Festival Plaza Drive Suite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89135

 

Court Documents

#26

No Description Available

#16

No Description Available

#14

No Description Available

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #6 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to 1 Motion to Compel. Responses due by 2/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 1/21/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) [Transferred from Nevada on 4/12/2021.] (Entered: 01/21/2021)

#38

(#38) EXHIBIT A filed filed by Plaintiffs Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. as to Motion to Compel Compliance #1 . (kh) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#37

(#37) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Emily B. Thomas to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC and designating Elizabeth M. Treckler as local counsel #35 by Judge Dale S. Fischer (lc) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#30

(#30) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#29

No Description Available

#28

No Description Available

#23

No Description Available

#18

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth M. Treckler and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jonathan D. Blum. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 1/27/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) [Transferred from Nevada on 4/12/2021.] (Entered: 01/27/2021)

#10

(#10) EXHIBIT to #7 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Plaintiffs Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Blum, Jonathan) [Transferred from Nevada on 4/12/2021.] (Entered: 01/26/2021)

#6

(#8) ORDER granting #6 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to 1 Motion to Compel. Responses due by 2/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 1/21/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) [Transferred from Nevada on 4/12/2021.] (Entered: 01/21/2021)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER (1) GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT BRIEFING #25 , (2) DENYING MOTION TO SEAL #2 , AND (3) DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL #1 by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. The Court grants Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement Briefing. The Clerk is directed to file Exhibit A [Dkt. No. 25-1] on the docket of this action. The Motion to Seal is denied. The Clerk is directed to remove the "Sealed" designation from the Motion to Compel [Dkt. No. 1] and Motion to Seal [Dkt. No. 2]. The Motion to Compel is denied. (see document for further details) (hr) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) EXHIBIT A filed filed by Plaintiffs Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. as to Motion to Compel Compliance #1 . (kh) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Emily B. Thomas to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC and designating Elizabeth M. Treckler as local counsel #35 by Judge Dale S. Fischer (lc) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER VACATING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND REQUIRING FURTHER BRIEFING RE: MOTION TO SEAL #1 , #2 by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. The Court finds Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Compliance of Non-Party O'Grady Law Group with Subpoena Issued August 31, 2020 [Dkt. No. 1] appropriate for decision without oral argument. Accordingly, the Court vacates the hearing set for May 5, 2021 and takes the matter under submission. Also pending before the Court is a Motion to Seal and Redact Exhibits ("Motion to Seal"), filed by Plaintiff. [Dkt. No. 2]. Any party or non-party supporting the Motion to Seal must file and serve a supplemental memorandum that complies with the Local Rules for the Central District of California, by no later than May 5, 2021. See L.R. 79-5. Any party or non-party opposing the Motion to Seal must file and serve a response to the supplemental memorandum by no later than May 11, 2021. (hr) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Emily B. Thomas to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31207288) filed by Plaintiffs Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Treckler, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • Docket(#34) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC MOTION HEARING by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Compliance of Non-Party O'Grady Law Group with Subpoena 1 is set for a telephonic hearing on May 5, 2021 at 10:00am Call information will be sent via separate email.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-05486 DSF (ADSx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue and Judge John A. Kronstadt to Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-03048 DSF (ADSx). Signed by Judge Dale S. Fischer (esa) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney William J O'Grady. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (et) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan D Blum on behalf of Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (et) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth M. Treckler and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jonathan D. Blum. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 1/27/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) [Transferred from Nevada on 4/12/2021.] (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) EXHIBIT to #7 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Plaintiffs Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Blum, Jonathan) [Transferred from Nevada on 4/12/2021.] (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #6 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to 1 Motion to Compel. Responses due by 2/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 1/21/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) [Transferred from Nevada on 4/12/2021.] (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth M. Treckler and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jonathan D. Blum (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6338256) by Plaintiffs Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Blum, Jonathan) [Transferred from Nevada on 4/12/2021.] (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re 1 MOTION to Compel by Interested Party O'Grady Law Group. (O'Grady, William) Modified on 1/21/2021 to add document link (MMM). [Transferred from Nevada on 4/12/2021.] (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RECEIPT of Payment: $ 402.00, receipt number NVLAS073523 (DRS) [Transferred from Nevada on 4/12/2021.] (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Emily B. Thomas, Elizabeth M. Treckler, Carrie Dettmer Slye to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 1/20/2021. (no image attached) (DKJ) [Transferred from Nevada on 4/12/2021.] (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (DKJ) [Transferred from Nevada on 4/12/2021.] (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • Docket(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required. The filing fee was not paid. Counsel is advised to pay the required filing fee. (no image attached) (DKJ) [Transferred from Nevada on 4/12/2021.] (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Transfer the Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Compliance of Non-Party O'Grady Law Group with Subpoena Issued August 31, 2020 to the United States District Court for the Central District of California by Plaintiffs Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. Responses due by 1/19/2021. (Blum, Jonathan) [Transferred from Nevada on 4/12/2021.] (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where O'Grady is a litigant

Latest cases where INTERMARKETING MEDIA, LLC, DBA Resort Advisory Group is a litigant

Latest cases where DEL MAR LAW GROUP, LLP is a litigant