This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/04/2022 at 08:33:56 (UTC).

Diamond Exteriors LLC v. Country Mutual Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 Diamond Exteriors LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Country Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael E. Hegarty and Daniel D. Domenico. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02989

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Michael E. Hegarty

Daniel D. Domenico

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diamond Exteriors LLC

Defendant

Country Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ethan Mamoru Sumida

3773 Cherry Creek North Drive, Suite 755

Denver, CO 80209

David J. Furtado

Attorney at Furtado Law PC

3773 Cherry Creek North Drive, Suite 755

Denver, CO 80209

Anna Regina Bloomer

Attorney at Furtado Law PC

3773 Cherry Creek North Drive, Suite 755

Denver, CO 80209

Tanner Westcott Havens

Attorney at Furtado Law PC

3773 Cherry Creek North Drive, Suite 755

Denver, CO 80209

Ethan M. Sumida

Attorney at Furtado Law PC

3773 Cherry Creek North Drive, Suite 755

Denver, CO 80209

Nathanael Thomas Archuleta

Attorney at Furtado Law PC

3773 Cherry Creek North Drive, Suite 755

Denver, CO 80209

Defendant Attorney

Brendan O'Rourke Powers

Attorney at Spies Powers & Robinson PC

950 South Cherry Street, Suite 700

Denver, CO 80246

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Anna Regina Bloomer on behalf of Diamond Exteriors LLCAttorney Anna Regina Bloomer added to party Diamond Exteriors LLC(pty:pla) (Bloomer, Anna) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Tanner Westcott Havens on behalf of Diamond Exteriors LLCAttorney Tanner Westcott Havens added to party Diamond Exteriors LLC(pty:pla) (Havens, Tanner) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

#20

(#20) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Diamond Exteriors LLC. (Archuleta, Nathanael) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#17

(#17) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02989-DDD. (athom, ) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#15

(#15) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Country Mutual Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Powers, Brendan) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#14

(#14) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Diamond Exteriors LLC. (Sumida, Ethan) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#13

(#13) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 23 November 2021. this Courts Order to Show Cause (ECF #10 ) is discharged. Consent Form due by 12/22/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/28/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2022 11:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#10

(#13) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 23 November 2021. this Courts Order to Show Cause (ECF #10 ) is discharged. Consent Form due by 12/22/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/28/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2022 11:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

2 #1

Exhibit A - Policy

1 #8

Preliminary Record Declaration of Service

1 #7

Preliminary Record Delay Reduction Order

1 #6

Preliminary Record Summons

1 #5

Preliminary Record Complaint and Jury Demand

1 #4

Preliminary Record Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint and Jury Demand

1 #1

Main Document

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Anna Regina Bloomer on behalf of Diamond Exteriors LLCAttorney Anna Regina Bloomer added to party Diamond Exteriors LLC(pty:pla) (Bloomer, Anna) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Tanner Westcott Havens on behalf of Diamond Exteriors LLCAttorney Tanner Westcott Havens added to party Diamond Exteriors LLC(pty:pla) (Havens, Tanner) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Diamond Exteriors LLC. (Archuleta, Nathanael) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Clerk of Court is instructed to terminate attorney Ethan M. Sumida as counsel of record, and to remove this name from the electronic certificate of mailing. Plaintiff Douglas Smith Builders LLC d/b/a Diamond Exteriors will continue to be represented by attorney David J. Furtado. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 12/16/2021. Text Only Entry(dddlc4) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • Docket(#18) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 12/16/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc4) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02989-DDD. (athom, ) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #15 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02989-REB. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Country Mutual Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Powers, Brendan) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Diamond Exteriors LLC. (Sumida, Ethan) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 23 November 2021. this Courts Order to Show Cause (ECF #10 ) is discharged. Consent Form due by 12/22/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/28/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2022 11:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DISCHARGED, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8 November 2021. It is ORDERED that Defendant file a written response to this Order to Show Cause on or before November 22, 2021, demonstrating why the Court should not remand this case (or recommend that it be remanded) for the Court's lack of subject matter jurisdiction (cmadr, ) Modified pursuant to ECF #13 on 11/23/2021 (cmadr, ). (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of David J. Furtado by Ethan Mamoru Sumida on behalf of Diamond Exteriors LLC (Sumida, Ethan) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ethan Mamoru Sumida on behalf of Diamond Exteriors LLCAttorney Ethan Mamoru Sumida added to party Diamond Exteriors LLC(pty:pla) (Sumida, Ethan) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (norlin, ) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) COMPLAINT against Country Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Diamond Exteriors LLC.(norlin, ) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (norlin, ) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • Docket(#4) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, ) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Powers, Brendan) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint by Country Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - 1/21/21 Letter, #3 Exhibit C - 3/9/21 Letter)(Powers, Brendan) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Country Mutual Insurance Company from City and County of Denver District Court, Case Number 2021-CV-033198. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8163921), filed by Country Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Preliminary Record Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Preliminary Record Complaint and Jury Demand, #6 Preliminary Record Summons, #7 Preliminary Record Delay Reduction Order, #8 Preliminary Record Declaration of Service)(Powers, Brendan) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNTRY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brendan O'Rourke Powers