This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/12/2022 at 08:38:54 (UTC).

Diagnostic Affiliates of Northeast Hou, LLC v. Aetna, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/13/2022 Diagnostic Affiliates of Northeast Hou, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Aetna, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Nelva Gonzales Ramos. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00127

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nelva Gonzales Ramos

 

Party Details

Defendants

Aetna, Inc.

Aetna Better Health of Texas Inc

Aetna Health And Life Insurance Company

Aetna Health Inc.

Aetna Health Insurance Company

Aetna Health Management, LLC

Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC

Meritain Health, Inc.

First Health Life & Health Insurance Company

ADP TotalSource, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan

Group Health & Welfare Plan

Exxon Mobil Medical Plan

AstraZeneca Health And Welfare Plan

Catholic Health Initiatives Master Trust

Costco Wholesale Corporation Cafeteria Plan

CVS Health Defined Benefit Plans Master Trust

Fidelity National Financial, Inc. Welfare Plan

Ge Global Health Plan

GT Services LLC Medical Insurance

67 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Khan Ebad

Attorney at Diagnostics Affiliates of Northeast Hou, LLC

24 Hour Covid, Ste 210

Kingwood, TX 77339

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Diagnostic Affiliates of Northeast Hou,LLC, filed.(Ebad, Khan) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(SashaOzuna, 2) (Main Document 5 replaced on 6/22/2022) (SashaOzuna, 2). (Main Document 5 replaced on 6/24/2022) (SashaOzuna, 2). (Entered: 06/22/2022)

4 #37

Summons

4 #36

Summons

4 #33

Summons

4 #31

Summons

4 #29

Summons

4 #23

Summons

4 #21

Summons

4 #15

Summons

4 #14

Summons

4 #13

Summons

4 #7

Summons

4 #6

Summons

4 #5

Summons

4 #4

Summons

4 #3

Summons

4 #2

Summons

83 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Diagnostic Affiliates of Northeast Hou,LLC, filed.(Ebad, Khan) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(SashaOzuna, 2) (Main Document 5 replaced on 6/22/2022) (SashaOzuna, 2). (Main Document 5 replaced on 6/24/2022) (SashaOzuna, 2). (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Aarthun Performance Group LTD Health Plan, Agility Recovery Solutions, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, American Air Liquide Holdings INC. Health Plan, Arkema INC. Health Plan, C. V. Starr & Co. Health Plan, Cemex, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Citigroup Legal Benefits Plan, Cox Enterprises, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Decypher Technologies Employee Benefits Plan, Defendant Leidos Employee Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Deloitte & Touche Welfare Benefit Plan, Enercon Services, Inc. Employee Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Entergy Corporation Companies' Bargaining Employees' Welfare Benefit Trust, First Community Bancshares, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, HCA Inc. And Welfare Benefits Plan, Hilton Worldwide Health Plan, Infosys BPM Limited Health Plan, Inframark, LLC Welfare Benefit Wrap Plan, International Cellulose Corporation Health Plan, Invesco Health Plan, Iqvia Inc. Health Plan, Lawler Foods, LTD. Health & Welfare Plan, Lockheed Martin Corporation Basic Benefit Plan For Hourly Employees, Magellan Health & Welfare Plan, Mccombs Enterprises Health Plan, Mitsubishi Electric U.S. Companies Health And Welfare Plan, Nustar Omnibus Welfare Plan, Occidental Petroleum Corporation Welfare Plan, Opko Health, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Repsol USA Holdings Corporation-Welfare Plans, Salesforce.com Health And Welfare Plan, Sap America Health & Welfare Plan, Shi International Corp. Health And Welfare Plan, Snap-on incorporated Non-Union Retiree Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, T-Mobile USA, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Tetra Tech, Inc. Fully Insured HMO Benefit Plan, The Iron Mountain Companies Welfare Plan, Transwestern Commercial Services Comprehensive Health And Welfare Benefit Plan, Trinet Group, Inc., Trinity University Welfare Benefit Plan, United Airlines Consolidated Welfare Benefit Plan, William Marsh Rice University Health And Welfare Plan, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts Health and Welfare Plan, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons, #28 Summons, #29 Summons, #30 Summons, #31 Summons, #32 Summons, #33 Summons, #34 Summons, #35 Summons, #36 Summons, #37 Summons, #38 Summons, #39 Summons, #40 Summons, #41 Summons, #42 Summons, #43 Summons)(Ebad, Khan) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketSummons Issued as to ADP TotalSource, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Accenture United States Group Health Plan, Aetna Better Health of Texas Inc, Aetna Health And Life Insurance Company, Aetna Health Inc., Aetna Health Insurance Company, Aetna Health Management, LLC, Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC, Aetna, Inc., Alight Solutions LLC Health And Welfare Plan, American International Group, Inc. Medical Plan, Aramco U. S. Welfare Benefit Plan, AstraZeneca Health And Welfare Plan, CVS Health Defined Benefit Plans Master Trust, Catholic Health Initiatives Master Trust, Collabera Inc. 125 Benefit Plan, Costco Wholesale Corporation Cafeteria Plan, Educational Testing Service Welfare Benefits Plan, Exxon Mobil Medical Plan, Fidelity National Financial, Inc. Welfare Plan, First Health Life & Health Insurance Company, GT Services LLC Medical Insurance, Ge Global Health Plan, Group Health & Welfare Plan, Group Welfare Plan for Quest Diagnostics Incorporated, Huntsman Corporation Employee Benefit Plan, Indorama Ventures Oxides, LLC Welfare Benefits Plan, KPMG LLP Health Plans., Linde Comprehensive Welfare Benefit Plan, Lyondell Chemical Co, Equistar Chemicals LP, And Houston Refining, LP Master Trust, Mann Eye Center PA Health And Welfare Plan, Memorial Hermann Health System Flexible Benefit Plan, Meritain Health, Inc., Oprona, Inc., Paychex Business Solutions LLC Employee Benefit Plan, R & L Carriers Group Benefits Plan, Restated Zions Bancorp. Employee and Retiree Welfare Benefit Plan, The Friedkin Group Welfare Benefits Plan, Torque Tools Inc Health Plan, UPS Health and Welfare Plan, Walmart Inc. Associates Health and Welfare Plan. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(ChristinaAvila, 2) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to ADP TotalSource, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Accenture United States Group Health Plan, Aetna Better Health of Texas Inc, Aetna Health And Life Insurance Company, Aetna Health Inc., Aetna Health Insurance Company, Aetna Health Management, LLC, Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC, Aetna, Inc., Alight Solutions LLC Health And Welfare Plan, American International Group, Inc. Medical Plan, Aramco U. S. Welfare Benefit Plan, AstraZeneca Health And Welfare Plan, CVS Health Defined Benefit Plans Master Trust, Catholic Health Initiatives Master Trust, Costco Wholesale Corporation Cafeteria Plan, Educational Testing Service Welfare Benefits Plan, Exxon Mobil Medical Plan, Fidelity National Financial, Inc. Welfare Plan, First Health Life & Health Insurance Company, GT Services LLC Medical Insurance, Ge Global Health Plan, Group Health & Welfare Plan, Group Welfare Plan for Quest Diagnostics Incorporated, Huntsman Corporation Employee Benefit Plan, Indorama Ventures Oxides, LLC Welfare Benefits Plan, Invesco Health Plan, KPMG LLP Health Plans., Linde Comprehensive Welfare Benefit Plan, Lyondell Chemical Co, Equistar Chemicals LP, And Houston Refining, LP Master Trust, Mann Eye Center PA Health And Welfare Plan, Memorial Hermann Health System Flexible Benefit Plan, Meritain Health, Inc., Oprona, Inc. Dba Rosen USA, INC, Paychex Business Solutions LLC Employee Benefit Plan, R & L Carriers Group Benefits Plan, Restated Zions Bancorp. Employee and Retiree Welfare Benefit Plan, The Friedkin Group Welfare Benefits Plan, Torque Tools Inc Health Plan, UPS Health and Welfare Plan, Walmart Inc. Associates Health and Welfare Plan, filed. (Attachments: #1 summons request, #2 summons request, #3 summons request, #4 summons request, #5 summons request, #6 summons request, #7 summons request, #8 summons request, #9 summons request, #10 summons request, #11 summons request, #12 summons request, #13 summons request, #14 summons request, #15 summons request, #16 summons request, #17 summons request, #18 summons request, #19 summons request, #20 summons request, #21 summons request, #22 summons request, #23 summons request, #24 summons request, #25 summons request, #26 summons request, #27 summons request, #28 summons request, #29 summons request, #30 summons request, #31 summons request, #32 summons request, #33 summons request, #34 summons request, #35 summons request, #36 summons request, #37 summons request, #38 summons request, #39 summons request, #40 summons request)(Ebad, Khan) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Parties notified.(SashaOzuna, 2) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-28315367) filed by Diagnostic Affiliates of Northeast Hou, LLC D/B/A 24 Hour Covid RT-PCR Laboratory. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Ebad, Khan) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST HEALTH LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Aetna Better Health Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where MERITAIN HEALTH, INC. is a litigant