This case was last updated from PACER on 09/10/2021 at 19:21:03 (UTC).

Diagnositc Affiliates of Northeast Hou, LLC v. United Health Group,Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 Diagnositc Affiliates of Northeast Hou, LLC filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against United Health Group,Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nelva Gonzales Ramos. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00131

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nelva Gonzales Ramos

 

Party Details

Defendants

Siemens Corporation Group Insurance and Flexible Benefits Program

AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No.1

Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom Partners' Welfare Benefits Plan

Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan

Apple Inc. Health and Welfare Benefit Plan

Group Benefits Plan for Employees of Worleyparsons Corporation

Brookdale Senior Living, Inc. Welfare Plan

Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals Welfare Benefit Plan

Kinder Morgan, Inc. Master Employee Welfare Plan

Fluor Employee Benefit Trust Plan

Lexicon Pharmaceuticals Inc. Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan

Geospace Technologies Welfare Benefit Plan

Webber, LLC Welfare Benefit Plan

Lineage Logistics LLC Benefits Plan

Republic Services Inc. Employee Benefit Plan

Motiva Enterprises LLC Health and Wellness Benefit Plan

Winstead PC Flexible Benefit Plan

Celanese Health and Welfare Benefits Program

United HealthCare Services, Inc.

Adecco, Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan

50 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Ebadullah Khan

Attorney at Diagnostics Affiliates of Northeast Hou, LLC

23330 Us-59 North, Suite 300

Kingwood, TX 77339

 

Court Documents

#61

(#61) ORDER granting #60 Motion for Continuance Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/4/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

#60

(#60) MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial Scheduling Conference by Diagnostic Affiliates of Northeast Hou, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/22/2021. (Khan, Ebadullah) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

#59

(#59) Summons Issued as to AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No.1, AT&T Umbrella Plan No. 3, Adecco, Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan, Delta Account Based Healthcare Plan, Fresenius Medical Care Travelling Nurses Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Geospace Technologies Welfare Benefit Plan, M/I Homes, Inc. Health, Life and Dental Welfare Plan, Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals Welfare Benefit Plan, Spirit Airlines Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Targa Resources LLC Welfare Benefits Plan, Transocean Group Welfare Benefits Plan, Valmont Industries Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, WCA Management Company, LP Welfare Benefit Plan. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JessieHutchinson, 2) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

#58

(#58) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Anadarko Petroleum Corp. Health Benefits Plan served on 7/27/2021, answer due 9/27/2021, filed.(Jubinsky, Andrew) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

#57

(#57) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Winstead PC Flexible Benefit Plan served on 7/27/2021, answer due 9/27/2021, filed.(Jubinsky, Andrew) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

#56

(#56) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to T-Mobile USA, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan served on 7/27/2021, answer due 9/27/2021, filed.(Jubinsky, Andrew) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

#55

(#55) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Republic Services Inc. Employee Benefit Plan served on 7/27/2021, answer due 9/27/2021, filed.(Jubinsky, Andrew) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

#54

(#54) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Railroad Employees National Health Flexible Spending Account Plan served on 7/27/2021, answer due 9/27/2021, filed.(Jubinsky, Andrew) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

#53

(#53) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom Partners' Welfare Benefits Plan served on 7/27/2021, answer due 9/27/2021, filed.(Jubinsky, Andrew) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

1 #17

Exhibit Exhibit Q

1 #16

Exhibit Exhibit P

1 #13

Exhibit Exhibit M

1 #11

Exhibit Exhibit K

1 #10

Exhibit Exhibit J

1 #8

Exhibit Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit Exhibit G

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

(#1) DOCKETED IN ERROR. ORIGINAL COMPLAINT CONTAINS PERSONAL INOFORMATION FROM A PATIENT. COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26668526) filed by Diagnositc Affiliates of Northeast Hou, LLC dba 24 Hour Covid RT-PCR Laboratory. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit Exhibit S)(Khan, Ebadullah) Modified on 6/29/2021 (JessieHutchinson, 2). (Entered: 06/29/2021)

82 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2021
  • Docket***Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan due by 10/21/2021. (fcarbia, 2) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) ORDER granting #60 Motion for Continuance Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/4/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial Scheduling Conference by Diagnostic Affiliates of Northeast Hou, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/22/2021. (Khan, Ebadullah) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) Summons Issued as to AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No.1, AT&T Umbrella Plan No. 3, Adecco, Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan, Delta Account Based Healthcare Plan, Fresenius Medical Care Travelling Nurses Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Geospace Technologies Welfare Benefit Plan, M/I Homes, Inc. Health, Life and Dental Welfare Plan, Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals Welfare Benefit Plan, Spirit Airlines Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Targa Resources LLC Welfare Benefits Plan, Transocean Group Welfare Benefits Plan, Valmont Industries Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, WCA Management Company, LP Welfare Benefit Plan. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JessieHutchinson, 2) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Anadarko Petroleum Corp. Health Benefits Plan served on 7/27/2021, answer due 9/27/2021, filed.(Jubinsky, Andrew) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Winstead PC Flexible Benefit Plan served on 7/27/2021, answer due 9/27/2021, filed.(Jubinsky, Andrew) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to T-Mobile USA, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan served on 7/27/2021, answer due 9/27/2021, filed.(Jubinsky, Andrew) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Republic Services Inc. Employee Benefit Plan served on 7/27/2021, answer due 9/27/2021, filed.(Jubinsky, Andrew) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Railroad Employees National Health Flexible Spending Account Plan served on 7/27/2021, answer due 9/27/2021, filed.(Jubinsky, Andrew) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom Partners' Welfare Benefits Plan served on 7/27/2021, answer due 9/27/2021, filed.(Jubinsky, Andrew) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Apple Inc. Health and Welfare Benefit Plan served on 7/27/2021, answer due 9/27/2021, filed.(Jubinsky, Andrew) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to American International Group, Inc. Medical Plan served on 7/27/2021, answer due 9/27/2021, filed.(Jubinsky, Andrew) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Southwest Airlines Co. Welfare Benefit Plan served on 7/27/2021, answer due 9/27/2021, filed.(Jubinsky, Andrew) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Siemens Corporation Group Insurance and Flexible Benefits Program served on 7/27/2021, answer due 9/27/2021, filed.(Jubinsky, Andrew) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Saia Motor Freight Line LLC Employee Preferred Provider Plan served on 7/27/2021, answer due 9/27/2021, filed.(Jubinsky, Andrew) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Procter and Gamble Retiree Welfare Benefits Plan served on 7/27/2021, answer due 9/27/2021, filed.(Jubinsky, Andrew) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Novo Nordisk Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan served on 7/27/2021, answer due 9/27/2021, filed.(Jubinsky, Andrew) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/9/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(vrios, 2) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Diagnositc Affiliates of Northeast Hou, LLC dba 24 Hour Covid RT-PCR Laboratory.(Khan, Ebadullah) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED IN ERROR. ORIGINAL COMPLAINT CONTAINS PERSONAL INOFORMATION FROM A PATIENT. COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26668526) filed by Diagnositc Affiliates of Northeast Hou, LLC dba 24 Hour Covid RT-PCR Laboratory. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit Exhibit S)(Khan, Ebadullah) Modified on 6/29/2021 (JessieHutchinson, 2). (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SKADDEN ARPS SLATE MEAGHER & FLOM LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where KELLOGG BROWN & ROOT SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Kinder Morgan Transmix Company, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Motiva Enterprises LLC is a litigant