Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/16/2021 at 07:46:25 (UTC).

DI LISCIA et al v. AUSTIN et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 DI LISCIA filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against AUSTIN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy J. Kelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01047

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy J. Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EDMUND DI LISCIA

MOHAMMED SHOYEB

LEANDROS KATSAREAS

DOMINQUE BRAGGS

Defendants

JOHN B. NOWELL, JR.

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY

ERIC J. ANDUZE

LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III

THOMAS HARKER

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel H. Blomberg

Attorney at THE BECKET FUND FOR RELIGIOUS LIBERTY

1919 Pennsylvania Ave. Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20006

Eric S. Baxter

Attorney at THE BECKET FUND FOR RELIGIOUS LIBERTY

1200 New Hampshire Avenue, Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant Attorney

Joseph F. Carilli, Jr.

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

555 4Th St Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ADMINISTRATIVE STAY ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/15/21. (lctjk2) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph F. Carilli, Jr on behalf of ERIC J. ANDUZE, LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, THOMAS HARKER, JOHN B. NOWELL, JR., UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY (Carilli, Joseph) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

5 #1

Notice and Consent

#5

(#5) SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel H. Blomberg on behalf of DOMINQUE BRAGGS, EDMUND DI LISCIA, LEANDROS KATSAREAS, MOHAMMED SHOYEB (Blomberg, Daniel) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric S. Baxter on behalf of DOMINQUE BRAGGS, EDMUND DI LISCIA, LEANDROS KATSAREAS, MOHAMMED SHOYEB (Baxter, Eric) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

2 #4

Declaration of Edmund Di Liscia

2 #3

Declaration of Eric S. Baxter

2 #2

Memorandum in Support

2 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#2

(#2) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by DOMINQUE BRAGGS, EDMUND DI LISCIA, LEANDROS KATSAREAS, MOHAMMED SHOYEB. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Declaration of Eric S. Baxter, #4 Declaration of Edmund Di Liscia)(Baxter, Eric) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

1 #18

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #17

Declaration of Eric S. Baxter

1 #16

Exhibit P

1 #15

Exhibit O

1 #14

Exhibit N

1 #13

Exhibit M

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ERIC J. ANDUZE, LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, THOMAS HARKER, JOHN B. NOWELL, JR., UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8376942) filed by DOMINQUE BRAGGS, LEANDROS KATSAREAS, EDMUND DI LISCIA, MOHAMMED SHOYEB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Declaration of Eric S. Baxter, #18 Civil Cover Sheet, #19 Summons Lloyd Austin, #20 Summons Department of Defense, #21 Summons Thomas Harker, #22 Summons John Nowell, #23 Summons Department of Navy, #24 Summons Eric Anduze)(Baxter, Eric) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Filing of confirmation due by 4/16/2021. (zkh) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ADMINISTRATIVE STAY ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/15/21. (lctjk2) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy J. Kelly: Telephonic TRO Motion Hearing held on 4/15/2021 re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Oral argument heard. Temporary Administrative Order to be entered by the court. Joint Status Report due by 4/22/2021. (Court Reporter: Timothy Miller) (zkh) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph F. Carilli, Jr on behalf of ERIC J. ANDUZE, LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, THOMAS HARKER, JOHN B. NOWELL, JR., UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY (Carilli, Joseph) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic TRO Motion Hearing set for 4/15/2021 at 2:00 PM before Judge Timothy J. Kelly. The parties shall contact the Courtroom Deputy immediately at (202) 354-3495 to make arrangements to appear. (zkh) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel H. Blomberg on behalf of DOMINQUE BRAGGS, EDMUND DI LISCIA, LEANDROS KATSAREAS, MOHAMMED SHOYEB (Blomberg, Daniel) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric S. Baxter on behalf of DOMINQUE BRAGGS, EDMUND DI LISCIA, LEANDROS KATSAREAS, MOHAMMED SHOYEB (Baxter, Eric) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by DOMINQUE BRAGGS, EDMUND DI LISCIA, LEANDROS KATSAREAS, MOHAMMED SHOYEB. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Declaration of Eric S. Baxter, #4 Declaration of Edmund Di Liscia)(Baxter, Eric) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ERIC J. ANDUZE, LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, THOMAS HARKER, JOHN B. NOWELL, JR., UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8376942) filed by DOMINQUE BRAGGS, LEANDROS KATSAREAS, EDMUND DI LISCIA, MOHAMMED SHOYEB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Declaration of Eric S. Baxter, #18 Civil Cover Sheet, #19 Summons Lloyd Austin, #20 Summons Department of Defense, #21 Summons Thomas Harker, #22 Summons John Nowell, #23 Summons Department of Navy, #24 Summons Eric Anduze)(Baxter, Eric) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Carilli Jr.