This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/23/2021 at 08:47:35 (UTC).

DFW LinQ Transport Inc v. D&M Carriers LLC

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 DFW LinQ Transport Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against D M Carriers LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark Pittman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00450

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark Pittman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DFW LinQ Transport Inc

Defendant

D&M Carriers LLC doing business as Freymiller

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth Mitchell Branning

Attorney at JB Schwartz PLLC

3838 Oak Lawn Ave., Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75219

Jon-Bernard Schwartz

Attorney at JB Schwartz PLLC

3838 Oak Lawn Ave., Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendant Attorneys

Paul A Ross

Attorney at McAfee & Taft A Professional Corporation

211 N Robinson, 8Th Floor

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-7103

Joshua W Solberg

Attorney at McAfee & Taft A Professional Corporation

211 N Robinson, 8Th Floor

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-7103

David B Dowell

Attorney at Naman Howell Smith & Lee

306 W 7Th Street, Ste 405

Fort Worth, TX 76102

 

Court Documents

#21

19 #2

Proposed Order Agreed Temporary Injunction

19 #1

Exhibit(s) "A" - Agreed Temporary Injunction

#19

#18

#17

12 #2

Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice

12 #1

Exhibit(s) "A" - Certificate of Good Standing

#12

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case terminated per #21 Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice. (tln) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by DFW LinQ Transport Inc (Cunningham, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • Docket(#20) ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark Pittman: Evidentiary Hearing held on 4/7/2021. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Elizabeth Cunningham; Defense - David Dowell. (Court Reporter: Monica Guzman) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :8. (chmb) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Temporary Injunction filed by D&M Carriers LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) "A" - Agreed Temporary Injunction, #2 Proposed Order Agreed Temporary Injunction) (Dowell, David) Docket text modified on 4/7/2021 (twd). (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Exhibit List by D&M Carriers LLC. (Dowell, David) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Witness List by D&M Carriers LLC. (Dowell, David) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joshua W. Solberg. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 4/6/2021) (chmb, bs) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul A. Ross. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 4/6/2021) (chmb, bs) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Exhibit List by DFW LinQ Transport Inc. (Cunningham, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Witness List by DFW LinQ Transport Inc. (Cunningham, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING TEMPORARY-INJUNCITON HEARING: It is therefore ORDERED that an evidentiary hearing on LinQ's application for temporary injunction is set at 9:00 a.m. on Wednesday, April 7, 2021, in the Fourth Floor Courtroom of the Eldon B. Mahon United States Courthouse, located at 501 W. 10th Street, Fort Worth, Texas. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that each party file both an exhibit list and witness list by 4:00 p.m. on Tuesday, April 6, 2021. (see order) (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 4/6/2021) (tln) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPLY filed by DFW LinQ Transport, Inc. re: #5 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing,,,,, (Cunningham, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by D&M Carriers, LLC re #5 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Dowell, David) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Certificate of Service re: #5 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing,,,,, filed by DFW LinQ Transport, Inc. (Cunningham, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to D&M Carriers, LLC. Waiver sent on 3/29/2021. (Cunningham, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER DENYING TRO AND SETTING TEMPORARY INJUCTION SCHEDULE: For these reasons, and the lack of a compliant Rule 65(b) certificate, LinQ's application for temporary restraining order is DENIED. Because LinQ also requests a temporary injunction, the Court ORDERS the following temporary-injunction schedule: (1) LinQ shall serve Freymiller with a copy of this Order no later than 5:00 p.m. on Monday, March 29, 2021, and shall file a certificate of service reflecting that such service has been made and the manner in which it was made; (2) Freymiller shall file a response brief to LinQ's motion for temporary injunction on or before 5:00 p.m. on Thursday, April 1, 2021; and (3) LinQ may file a reply to Freymiller's response by 5:00 p.m. on Monday, April 5, 2021, but any reply may not contain any new evidence. It is further ORDERED that if the Court concludes that an evidentiary hearing on LinQ's application for temporary injunction is necessary, it will be held at 9:00 a.m. on Wednesday, April 7, 2021, in the Fourth Floor Courtroom of the Eldon B. Mahon United States Courthouse, located at 501 W. 10th Street, Fort Worth, Texas. The Court will notify the parties after reviewing all submissions whether the hearing will be held. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 3/26/2021) (tln) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Complaince with FRCP 65 for Ex Parte Relief re: #1 Complaint,,,, filed by DFW LinQ Transport, Inc. (Cunningham, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (tln) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DFW LinQ Transport, Inc.. (Cunningham, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against D&M Carriers, LLC filed by DFW LinQ Transport, Inc. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11727557) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Cunningham, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DFW LinQ Transport, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where D & M Carriers, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jon-Bernard Schwartz