This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/27/2020 at 10:00:37 (UTC).

Dey v. Subaru of North America, Inc. (PLR2)

Case Summary

On 06/28/2020 Dey filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Subaru of North America, Inc PLR2. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Pamela L Reeves and H Bruce Guyton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00289

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela L Reeves

Referral Judge

H Bruce Guyton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lesley Dey

Defendants

Subaru of North America, Inc

Subaru of North America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Darren V Berg

Attorney at Law Offices of Darren V. Berg

Po Box 33113

Knoxville, TN 37930

Defendant Attorney

John Randolph Bibb, Jr

Attorney at Lewis, Thomason, King, Krieg & Waldrop, P.C. (Nashville)

424 Church Street, Suite 2500, Po Box 198615

Nashville, TN 37219-8615

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent

#14

#13

#12

#11

10 #1

Summons

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Supplement Order of Dismissal

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 8/3/20. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Subaru of North America, Inc.. (Bibb, John) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Subaru of North America, Inc..(Bibb, John) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by John Randolph Bibb, Jr on behalf of Subaru of North America, Inc. (Bibb, John) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lesley Dey. Subaru of North America, Inc. served on 7/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Berg, Darren) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Subaru of North America, Inc. (AYB) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Summons by Lesley Dey. (Berg, Darren) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 06/30/2020. (CAT) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 06/30/2020. (CAT) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 06/30/2020. (CAT) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Administrative Notice to Counsel #2 Supplement : Please refile a completed non fillable Summons with the attorney information using the event Supplement under Other Documents and link it back to the Complaint. Requirements due by 7/6/2020. (CAT) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint : INFORMATION ONLY. For future reference, please file the Civil Cover Sheet in a non-fillable format. (CAT) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketDistrict Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (CAT) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Summons by Lesley Dey. (Berg, Darren) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Subaru of North America, Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4391501.), filed by Lesley Dey. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Order of Dismissal)(Berg, Darren) (Entered: 06/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Randolph Bibb, Jr.