Dexcom, Inc. et al v. Medtronic, Inc. et al

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Medtronic, Inc.; Does 1-20 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-16162324.), filed by Dexcom, Inc., Charles Boykin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1677-L-LL. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case. (Barnes, Brook) (fth) (rmc). (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (fth) (rmc). (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Exhibit List (Exhibits 1-7 to Complaint) by Dexcom, Inc.. (Barnes, Brook) (jpp). (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE ORDER. Judge M. James Lorenz is no longer assigned as presiding Judge. Case reassigned to Judge Marilyn L. Huff for all further proceedings. The new case number is 21cv1677-H-LL.(no document attached) (sjt) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Charles Boykin, Dexcom, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Declaration of Brook T. Barnes, #3 Declaration Declaration of Charles Boykin, #4 Declaration Declaration of Chuck Donlon, #5 Notice Notice of Lodgment, #6 Exhibit Exhibits 1-13 to Notice of Lodgment)(Barnes, Brook) (anh). (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL: Judge Marilyn L. Huff hereby recuses from this case and directs the Clerk to randomly reassign this case to another district judge. This case has been randomly reassigned to Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo for all further proceedings. Judge Marilyn L. Huff is no longer assigned to this case. The new case number is 21-cv-1677-CAB-LL. SO ORDERED by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 9/29/2021. (no document attached) (smy) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule for Application for Temporary Restraining Order [Doc. No. #5 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 9/30/2021.(anh) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt A Kappes on behalf of Medtronic, Inc. (Kappes, Kurt)Attorney Kurt A Kappes added to party Medtronic, Inc.(pty:dft) (anh). (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Madeline Jean Orlando on behalf of Medtronic, Inc. (Orlando, Madeline)Attorney Madeline Jean Orlando added to party Medtronic, Inc.(pty:dft) (anh). (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dexcom, Inc., Charles Boykin. Medtronic, Inc. served. (Barnes, Brook) (anh). (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dexcom, Inc., Charles Boykin. Medtronic, Inc. served. (Barnes, Brook) (anh). (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Dominick Lane on behalf of Medtronic, Inc. (Lane, Michael)Attorney Michael Dominick Lane added to party Medtronic, Inc.(pty:dft) (jrm). (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE re #7 Order Setting Briefing Schedule, Order to Show Cause filed by Charles Boykin, Dexcom, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brook Barnes, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Brook Barnes, #3 Declaration of Chuck Donlon, #4 Declaration of Charles Boykin)(Barnes, Brook) (anh). (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Madeline Orlando ISO Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibits 1-5 to Declaration of Madeline Orlando, #3 Request for Judicial Notice)(Kappes, Kurt) (anh). (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Errata to Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Judicial Notice by Medtronic, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6 to the Request for Judicial Notice and Declaration of Madeline Orlando)(Kappes, Kurt) (anh). (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Stay Proceedings by Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Kappes, Kurt) (anh). (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Charles Boykin, Dexcom, Inc.. (Barnes, Brook) (anh). (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Medtronic, Inc.. (Kappes, Kurt) (anh). (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MINUTE ORDER: An in-person hearing on Plaintiffs Application for Temporary Restraining Order and the Courts Order to Show Cause is set for October 29, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 15A. [See Doc. No. 7 at 2.] If any parties want to listen to the hearing by telephone, they are instructed to connect (at least five minutes prior to the hearing) through an AT&T Teleconference connection at (888) 398-2342, access code: 1749358.(anh) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo: Motion Hearing held on 10/29/2021 re #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Charles Boykin, Dexcom, Inc. For reasons stated on the record, the motion is denied. (Court Reporter/ECR Anne Roldan). (Plaintiff Attorney Brook Barnes).(Defendant Attorney Kurt Kappes). (no document attached) (lmh) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Motion Hearing) held on 10/29/2021 before Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Anne Roldan. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 11/19/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2022. (akr) (Entered: 10/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Stay Proceedings filed by Charles Boykin, Dexcom, Inc.. (Barnes, Brook) (anh). (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Stay Proceedings filed by Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Reply, #2 Declaration of Madeline Orlando in Support of Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit 1-5 to Dec of Madeline Orlando)(Kappes, Kurt) (anh). (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less