This case was last updated from PACER on 12/14/2020 at 08:22:50 (UTC).

DeWitt v. Experian plc

Case Summary

On 10/15/2020 DeWitt filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Experian plc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tony N. Leung and David S. Doty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-02169

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tony N. Leung

Presiding Judge

David S. Doty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elizabeth DeWitt

Defendant

Experian plc doing business as Experian Information Solution, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David W Larson

Attorney at Martin & Squires P.A.

332 Minnesota Street Ste W2750, None

St Paul, MN 55101

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher Adam Hall

Attorney at Jones Day

77 W. Wacker Dr., Suite 3500

Chicago, IL 60601

Gregory John Myers

Attorney at Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP

100 Washington Ave S Ste 2200

Mpls, MN 55401-2179

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Consent Form

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 1/27/2021 at 04:00 PM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 12/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Experian plc. (Myers, Gregory) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER on #7 Stipulation. Experian plc answer due 12/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 11/10/2020. (HAM) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher Hall. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8211047 filed by Experian plc. (Myers, Gregory) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#9

(#9) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Experian plc. (Myers, Gregory) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#8

(#8) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 Stipulation. (Myers, Gregory) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION of Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Experian plc. Jointly Signed by Elizabeth DeWitt. (Myers, Gregory) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Elizabeth DeWitt re #5 Summons Issued Served Oct 20 (Larson, David) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Experian plc. (kt) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

2 #3

Exhibit(s) Exhibit C to Complaint

2 #2

Exhibit(s) Exhibit B to Complaint

2 #1

Exhibit(s) Exhibit A to Complaint

#2

(#2) EXHIBIT LIST to Complaint filed by Elizabeth DeWitt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint)(Larson, David) Modified text on 10/16/2020 (MMP). (Entered: 10/15/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Against Experian against Elizabeth DeWitt (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8141005) filed by Elizabeth DeWitt. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet) (Larson, David) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 1/27/2021 at 04:00 PM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 12/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Experian plc. (Myers, Gregory) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christopher Adam Hall for Experian plc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 11/13/2020. (NAH) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER on #7 Stipulation. Experian plc answer due 12/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 11/10/2020. (HAM) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher Hall. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8211047 filed by Experian plc. (Myers, Gregory) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Experian plc. (Myers, Gregory) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 Stipulation. (Myers, Gregory) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION of Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Experian plc. Jointly Signed by Elizabeth DeWitt. (Myers, Gregory) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Elizabeth DeWitt re #5 Summons Issued Served Oct 20 (Larson, David) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Experian plc. (kt) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 20-cv-2169 DSD/TNL. (kt) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • Docket(#3) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Request to Clerk's Office to Issue Summons for Experian Elizabeth DeWitt. (Larson, David) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) EXHIBIT LIST to Complaint filed by Elizabeth DeWitt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint)(Larson, David) Modified text on 10/16/2020 (MMP). (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Against Experian against Elizabeth DeWitt (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8141005) filed by Elizabeth DeWitt. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet) (Larson, David) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less