This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:26:12 (UTC).

Dewalt-Gallman v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Dewalt-Gallman filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paige J Gossett and J Michelle Childs. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-03400

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Paige J Gossett

Presiding Judge

J Michelle Childs

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Betty Dewalt-Gallman

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Interested Party

Social Security Administrative Record

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul Townsend McChesney

Attorney at McChesney and McChesney PC

930 South Pine Street

Spartanburg, SC 29302

 

Court Documents

#3

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is reminded that she is responsible for service of process pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(1) unless she provides the court with completed USM-285 forms so that service can be effected by the U.S. Marshals Service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). If service is not effected within 90 days, this action will be recommended for dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Rule 4(m). Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 12/16/2019. (kkus, ) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (lbak) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Betty Dewalt-Gallman. Response to Motion due by 12/19/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. otions referred to Paige J. Gossett. (lbak) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.02 regarding Consents to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website., filed by Betty Dewalt-Gallman. Service due by 3/4/2020 (lbak) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.