This case was last updated from PACER on 11/15/2020 at 06:46:16 (UTC).

Devon Energy Production Company LP et al v. United States Department of the Interior

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 Devon Energy Production Company LP filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against United States Department of the Interior. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy D. DeGiusti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00053

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy D. DeGiusti

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Devon Energy Corporation

Devon Energy Production Company LP

Defendant

United States Department of the Interior

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rosario C Doriott Dominguez

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler - DENVER

1801 California St, Suite 4400

Denver, CO 80202

Mark B McDaniel

Attorney at Devon Energy Corporation

20 N Broadway Ave

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Lyle P Leggette

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler - HOUSTON

811 Main St, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorney

Alison Spurlock

Attorney at US Attorney's Office-OKC

210 W Park Ave, Suite 400

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#34

(#34) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #32 Brief, #30 Brief, #33 Response of Opening Brief by Devon Energy Corporation, Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Leggette, Lyle) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#33

(#33) RESPONSE re #32 Brief - Amended Brief filed by United States Department of the Interior. (Spurlock, Alison) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#32

(#32) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #31 Order, #29 Brief Amended Brief by Devon Energy Corporation, Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Leggette, Lyle) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#31

(#31) ORDER Granting #30 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to File Amended Opening Brief. Amended Opening Brief due within 3 days. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 7/20/2020. (mb) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

30 #1

Attachment Proposed Amended Opening Brief

#30

(#30) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #29 Brief (AMENDED OPENING BRIEF) by Devon Energy Corporation, Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Amended Opening Brief)(Leggette, Lyle) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#29

(#29) BRIEF IN SUPPORT by Devon Energy Corporation, Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Leggette, Lyle) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#28

(#28) ORDER granting #27 Plaintiff Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.'s Unopposed Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record. Documents submitted as attachment 1 to the Motion [Doc. No. 27-1] and Bates numbered AR_8675-76 and AR_8677 shall be included in the Administrative Record submitted by Defendant as Exhibits A and B to Plaintiffs Statement of Reasons and Request for Hearing (AR_0095-0135). Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 7/16/2020. (mb) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#27

(#27) UNOPPOSED MOTION to Supplement Administrative Record by Devon Energy Corporation, Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Attachment AR_8675-AR_8677 SoR Exhibits A and B, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Leggette, Lyle) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Department of the Interior. (kmt) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#7

(#7) ENTRY of Appearance by Rosario C Doriott Dominguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Doriott Dominguez, Rosario) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#6

(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Lyle P Leggette on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Leggette, Lyle) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#5

(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Mark B McDaniel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McDaniel, Mark) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by All Plaintiffs . (McDaniel, Mark) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#3

(#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by All Plaintiffs . (McDaniel, Mark) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Department of the Interior. (kmt) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against United States Department of the Interior filed by Devon Energy Production Company LP, Devon Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #32 Brief, #30 Brief, #33 Response of Opening Brief by Devon Energy Corporation, Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Leggette, Lyle) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) RESPONSE re #32 Brief - Amended Brief filed by United States Department of the Interior. (Spurlock, Alison) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma (OKWD) is upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, August 3, 2020. Complete information regarding the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF implementation is available at #http://www.okwd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-information.****Currently, you may share a single PACER account with other attorneys in your firm. With the new OKWD NextGen CM/ECF system, sharing of individual PACER accounts is prohibited. You must have an individual upgraded PACER account linked to your e-filing account. Once again, shared PACER accounts cannot be used by OKWD e-filing attorneys. ****Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one is to upgrade your PACER account and step two is to link your upgraded PACER account to the OKWD e-filing account in the upgraded NextGen CM/ECF system. This notice only addresses the first step because the second step cannot be completed until on or after August 3, 2020. ****Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. The first step is to determine whether you have an "Upgraded" PACER account. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on August 3, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If neither of these is true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you can link your PACER account to your new NextGen CM/ECF account. ****OKWDs current CM/ECF system will NOT be available from 11:00 AM on 07/31/20 until 8:00 AM on 08/03/20 due to the upgrade. ****Additional notices will be sent at a later date regarding the second step of this process. If you have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856 or the OKWD Clerk's Office CM/ECF Help Desk at 405-609-5555. (Pigott, William) (ADI) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #31 Order, #29 Brief Amended Brief by Devon Energy Corporation, Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Leggette, Lyle) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER Granting #30 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to File Amended Opening Brief. Amended Opening Brief due within 3 days. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 7/20/2020. (mb) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #29 Brief (AMENDED OPENING BRIEF) by Devon Energy Corporation, Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Amended Opening Brief)(Leggette, Lyle) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) BRIEF IN SUPPORT by Devon Energy Corporation, Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Leggette, Lyle) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER granting #27 Plaintiff Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.'s Unopposed Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record. Documents submitted as attachment 1 to the Motion [Doc. No. 27-1] and Bates numbered AR_8675-76 and AR_8677 shall be included in the Administrative Record submitted by Defendant as Exhibits A and B to Plaintiffs Statement of Reasons and Request for Hearing (AR_0095-0135). Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 7/16/2020. (mb) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) UNOPPOSED MOTION to Supplement Administrative Record by Devon Energy Corporation, Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Attachment AR_8675-AR_8677 SoR Exhibits A and B, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Leggette, Lyle) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Conventionally Filed Exhibit: #25 NOTICE of Conventional Filing of the Administrative Record by Defendant United States Department of the Interior; 11 binders taken to chambers, 12 binders placed in file room. (kmt) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ENTRY of Appearance by Alison Spurlock on behalf of United States Department of the Interior (Spurlock, Alison) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Department of the Interior. (kmt) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ENTRY of Appearance by Rosario C Doriott Dominguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Doriott Dominguez, Rosario) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Lyle P Leggette on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Leggette, Lyle) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Mark B McDaniel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McDaniel, Mark) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by All Plaintiffs . (McDaniel, Mark) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by All Plaintiffs . (McDaniel, Mark) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3076522. (Leggette, Lyle) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Department of the Interior. (kmt) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against United States Department of the Interior filed by Devon Energy Production Company LP, Devon Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less