This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/24/2022 at 07:54:58 (UTC).

Devoe v. Fawn Lake Forest Association

Case Summary

On 04/25/2022 Devoe filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Fawn Lake Forest Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Karoline Mehalchick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00602

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karoline Mehalchick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas Devoe

Defendant

Fawn Lake Forest Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ari R. Karpf

Attorney at Karpf, Karpf & Cerutti, P.C.

3331 Street Road, Two Greenwood Square

Bensalem, PA 19020

JEREMY M. CERUTTI

Attorney at KARPF, KARPF & CERUTTI, P.C.

3331 Street Road, Suite 128, Two Greenwood Square

Bensalem, PA 19020

Defendant Attorney

Mark Joseph Kozlowski

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey

50 Glenmaura National Boulevard, P.O. Box 3118

Moosic, PA 18507

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Fawn Lake Forest Association ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5925127) filed by Thomas Devoe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dw) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Fawn Lake Forest Association and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet MJ) (dw) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

2 #1

Summons Packet MJ

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Fawn Lake Forest Association. Fawn Lake Forest Association waiver sent on 4/26/2022, answer due 6/27/2022. (Kozlowski, Mark) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Joseph Kozlowski on behalf of Fawn Lake Forest Association (Kozlowski, Mark) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#5

(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Fawn Lake Forest Association. (Kozlowski, Mark) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#6

(#6) CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Thomas Devoe, Fawn Lake Forest Association YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE COMPLETED FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU DO NOT HAVE AN E-MAIL ACCOUNT YOU MAY MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 6/28/2022 (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Direct Consent Form) (cw) (Entered: 05/29/2022)

6 #1

Defendant's Direct Consent Form

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by JEREMY M. CERUTTI on behalf of Thomas Devoe (CERUTTI, JEREMY) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by JEREMY M. CERUTTI on behalf of Thomas Devoe (CERUTTI, JEREMY) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Thomas Devoe, Fawn Lake Forest Association YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE COMPLETED FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU DO NOT HAVE AN E-MAIL ACCOUNT YOU MAY MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 6/28/2022 (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Direct Consent Form) (cw) (Entered: 05/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Fawn Lake Forest Association. (Kozlowski, Mark) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Joseph Kozlowski on behalf of Fawn Lake Forest Association (Kozlowski, Mark) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Fawn Lake Forest Association. Fawn Lake Forest Association waiver sent on 4/26/2022, answer due 6/27/2022. (Kozlowski, Mark) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Fawn Lake Forest Association and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet MJ) (dw) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Fawn Lake Forest Association ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5925127) filed by Thomas Devoe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dw) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Joseph Kozlowski