This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/28/2022 at 08:58:34 (UTC).

DEVINE v. OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 11/29/2021 DEVINE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert J. Colville. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01735

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert J. Colville

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHARON DEVINE

Defendants

OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY

L S R E F 4 REBOUND, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas J. McClain

Attorney at Dugan & Associates

4 West Manilla Ave

Pittsburgh, PA 15220

Defendant Attorneys

Christine O. Boyd

Attorney at Lavin, O'Neil, Ricci, Cedrone & DiSipio

190 North Independence Mall Westsuite 500, 6Th And Race Streets

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Joseph Armando Manno

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

950 Main Avenuesuite 1100

Cleveland, OH 44113

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) MOTION for attorney Joseph A. Manno to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6863925) by OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY. (Manno, Joseph) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY. (Boyd, Christine) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement identifying Otis Worldwide Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY. (Boyd, Christine) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 12/1/21. (jg) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

1 #11

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F-Original Complaint

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alleghey County, case number GD19-011793 with 260,000 Copies attached: Original Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6825569), filed by OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F-Original Complaint, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet) (elt) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Joseph A. Manno, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Otis Elevator Company. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 12/21/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jg) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for attorney Joseph A. Manno to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6863925) by OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY. (Manno, Joseph) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY. (Boyd, Christine) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement identifying Otis Worldwide Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY. (Boyd, Christine) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jg) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 12/1/21. (jg) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alleghey County, case number GD19-011793 with 260,000 Copies attached: Original Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6825569), filed by OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F-Original Complaint, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet) (elt) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Otis Elevator Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph A. Manno

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christine O. Boyd