This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/01/2021 at 07:04:27 (UTC).

deVera v. General Mills, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 deVera filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against General Mills, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edward M. Chen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-02418

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edward M. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michelle deVera

Petitioners

Kathryn Mccarthy

Gabrielle Stuve

Defendant

General Mills, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

L. Timothy Fisher

Attorney at Bursor & Fisher, P.A.

1990 North California Boulevard, Suite 940

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Petitioner Attorney

Michael Liskow

Attorney at Calcaterra Pollack LLP

1140 Avenue Of The Americas, 9Th Floor

New York, NY 10036-5803

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#4

#5

#6

#8

#9

#10

#11

11 #1

Exhibit 1

11 #2

Exhibit 2

11 #3

Exhibit 3

#12

#13

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • Docket(#14) CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IN RELATED CASES: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/29/2021. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emc General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/29/2021. Initial Case Ma nagement Conference set for 8/5/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2021) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2021) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER RELATING CASE. Cases 21-cv-2415-EMC, Mccarthy et al v. Annie's Homegrown, Inc., and 21-cv-2462-HSG, Angelos et al v. Annie's Homegrown, Inc. related and reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/20/2021. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2021) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Declaration of Michael Liskow in Support of #10 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related re C-21-2415-EMC and C-21-2462-HSG, filed by Kathryn Mccarthy, Gabrielle Stuve. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #10 ) (Liskow, Michael) (Filed on 4/19/2021) Modified on 4/20/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related re C-21-2415-EMC and C-21-2462-HSG filed by Kathryn Mccarthy, Gabrielle Stuve. Responses due by 4/23/2021. (Liskow, Michael) (Filed on 4/19/2021) Modified on 4/20/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2021 at 02:00 PM -Videoconference Only. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/8/2021. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2021) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 4/8/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2021) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2021) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michelle deVera.. (Fisher, L.) (Filed on 4/6/2021) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/30/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/7/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2021) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to General Mills, Inc.. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2021) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/19/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2021) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Fisher, L.) (Filed on 4/2/2021) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against General Mills, Inc. with jury demand ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15789949.). Filed byMichelle deVera. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fisher, L.) (Filed on 4/2/2021) Modified on 4/5/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GENERAL MILLS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Liskow