This case was last updated from PACER on 12/20/2019 at 09:02:02 (UTC).

DEUTSCH v. THE TORO COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/21/2019 DEUTSCH filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against THE TORO COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-05019

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JANE L. DEUTSCH

Defendant

THE TORO COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARK K. ALTEMOSE

Attorney at COHEN & FEELEY, PC

2851 Baglyos Circle

Bethlehem, PA 18020

Defendant Attorneys

KENNETH T. NEWMAN

Attorney at THOMAS THOMAS & HAFER LLP

525 William Penn Pl, 37Th Fl Suite 3750

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

GEORGE RICHARD MURPHY

Attorney at Thomas, Thomas & Hafer LLP

525 William Penn Place, 37Th Floor, Suite 3750

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

LAURA J. HERZOG

Attorney at THOMAS, THOMAS & HAFER, LLP

1550 Pond Road Suite 210

Allentown, PA 18104

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by THE TORO COMPANY.(NEWMAN, KENNETH) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Designation Form and Case Management Track Designation Form

#1

(#1) Complaint with Jury Trial Demanded against THE TORO COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number APE005344.), filed by PLAINTIFF JANE L. DEUTSCH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Designation Form and Case Management Track Designation Form)(DT) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE RICHARD MURPHY on behalf of THE TORO COMPANY with Certificate of Service(MURPHY, GEORGE) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JANE L. DEUTSCH. THE TORO COMPANY waiver sent on 11/7/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (ALTEMOSE, MARK) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by KENNETH T. NEWMAN on behalf of THE TORO COMPANY with Certificate of Service(NEWMAN, KENNETH) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA J. HERZOG on behalf of THE TORO COMPANY with Certificate of Service(HERZOG, LAURA) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by THE TORO COMPANY.(NEWMAN, KENNETH) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE RICHARD MURPHY on behalf of THE TORO COMPANY with Certificate of Service(MURPHY, GEORGE) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA J. HERZOG on behalf of THE TORO COMPANY with Certificate of Service(HERZOG, LAURA) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by KENNETH T. NEWMAN on behalf of THE TORO COMPANY with Certificate of Service(NEWMAN, KENNETH) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JANE L. DEUTSCH. THE TORO COMPANY waiver sent on 11/7/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (ALTEMOSE, MARK) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • 1 Original Summons Issued as to THE TORO COMPANY. Forwarded To: Counsel on 10/21/19. (DT) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • Jury Trial Demanded by JANE L. DEUTSCH. (DT) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint with Jury Trial Demanded against THE TORO COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number APE005344.), filed by PLAINTIFF JANE L. DEUTSCH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Designation Form and Case Management Track Designation Form)(DT) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.