This case was last updated from PACER on 12/03/2021 at 10:11:29 (UTC).

Deters v. Facebook, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 Deters filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Facebook, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Edward B. Atkins, William O. Bertelsman, P SO and David L. Bunning. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00124

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Referral Judges

Edward B. Atkins

P SO

Presiding Judges

William O. Bertelsman

David L. Bunning

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eric C. Deters

Independence, KY 41051

Defendants

Facebook, Inc.

Facebook Payments Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Grahmn Morgan

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl LLP - Lexington

100 W. Main Street, Suite 900, City Center

Lexington, KY 40507

Seth T. Church

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl LLP - Lexington

100 W. Main Street, Suite 900, City Center

Lexington, KY 40507

Adrianne C. Strong

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl LLP - Lexington

100 W. Main Street, Suite 900, City Center

Lexington, KY 40507

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) AGREED ORDER: Plaintiff shall respond to the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #13 on or before 12/15/2021. Defendants shall reply on or before 1/12/2022. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 11/17/2021.(TJZ)cc: COR and Eric Deters by US Mail (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#14

(#14) Proposed Agreed Order Extending Time to Respond and Reply to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Facebook Payments Inc., Facebook, Inc.. (Morgan, Grahmn) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

13 #3

Proposed Order

13 #2

Exhibit Decl. of Jenny Pricer

13 #1

Memorandum in Support

13 #13

Main Document

#12

#11

#10

#7

#6

#5

#4

3 #1

Sample Caption Page

3 #3

Main Document

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) AGREED ORDER: Plaintiff shall respond to the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #13 on or before 12/15/2021. Defendants shall reply on or before 1/12/2022. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 11/17/2021.(TJZ)cc: COR and Eric Deters by US Mail (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Proposed Agreed Order Extending Time to Respond and Reply to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Facebook Payments Inc., Facebook, Inc.. (Morgan, Grahmn) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Dismiss by Facebook Payments Inc., Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Decl. of Jenny Pricer, #3 Proposed Order)(Morgan, Grahmn) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Facebook Payments Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Faceook, Inc. for Facebook Payments Inc... (Morgan, Grahmn) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Facebook, Inc.. (Morgan, Grahmn) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR and Eric Deters by US Mail (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: That this matter be, and it is, hereby reassigned to the Honorable David L. Bunning, Judge of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 10/8/2021.(ECO)cc: COR and Eric Deters by US Mail (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AGREED ORDER: That, for good cause shown, the Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's Amended Complaint on or before November 10, 2021. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 10/7/2021.(ECO)cc: COR and Eric Deters by US Mail (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of William O. Bertelsman for review: #5 Proposed Agreed Order Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by Facebook Payments Inc., Facebook, Inc., re Amended Complaint (ECO) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCase no longer referred to P SO, per Chambers. (ECO) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Agreed Order Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by Facebook Payments Inc., Facebook, Inc.. (Morgan, Grahmn) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #1 Notice of Removal (ECO) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER re: Disclosure of Contact Information: 1. pro se litigants must provide current telephone number, residential address, & if different, mailing address. 2. pro se litigants must provide written notice of change of residential address, & if different, mailing address. 3. Clerk file copy of Order in all non-prisoner pro se actions. Failure to provide required information or change of address may result in appropriate sanctions.. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 6/6/2016.(ECO)cc: CORand Eric Deters by US Mail (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(ECO) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketConflict Check run. (ECO) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kenton Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-1348. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5091341), filed by Facebook Payments Inc., Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ECO) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Facebook Payments Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Facebook is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adrianne C. Strong

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Grahmn Morgan