This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/18/2022 at 07:30:15 (UTC).

DESPORT et al v. ADESA PENNSYLVANIA, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 DESPORT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ADESA PENNSYLVANIA, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Marilyn J. Horan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01695

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marilyn J. Horan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VICTOR DESPORT

TINA DESPORT

Defendants

ADESA PENNSYLVANIA, LLC doing business as ADESA PITTSBURGH

ADESA CORPORATION doing business as ADESA AUCTIONS PITTSBURGH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cindy Stine

Attorney at Stine & Associates, P.C.

231 South Main Street, Suite 205

Greensburg, PA 15601

Defendant Attorney

Sean T. Stadelman

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP

1700 Market Street, Suite 1418

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Westmoreland County, case number 4927 of 2019 (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWD-6814934), filed by ADESA PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, ADESA CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Original Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (elt) (Entered: 11/21/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit A Original Complaint

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. (bjl) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ADESA CORPORATION, ADESA PENNSYLVANIA, LLC. (Stadelman, Sean) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#5

(#5) Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by ADESA PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, ADESA CORPORATION Answer due from All Defendants. (Stadelman, Sean) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#6

(#6) Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by ADESA PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, ADESA CORPORATION Answer due from All Defendants on 01/21/2022. (Stadelman, Sean) Modified text on 1/7/2022. (pak) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketUpdate Answer Deadline: Answer due from ADESA CORPORATION on 1/21/2022; ADESA PENNSYLVANIA, LLC on 1/21/2022 (pak) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by ADESA PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, ADESA CORPORATION Answer due from All Defendants on 01/21/2022. (Stadelman, Sean) Modified text on 1/7/2022. (pak) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by ADESA PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, ADESA CORPORATION Answer due from All Defendants. (Stadelman, Sean) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ADESA CORPORATION, ADESA PENNSYLVANIA, LLC. (Stadelman, Sean) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. (bjl) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE available #Here Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 11/22/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF docum ent will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant to L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 11/29/2021. (ept) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Westmoreland County, case number 4927 of 2019 (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWD-6814934), filed by ADESA PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, ADESA CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Original Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (elt) (Entered: 11/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Adesa, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean T. Stadelman