This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:18:30 (UTC).

DESOUSA v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability case was filed by DESOUSA against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-17153

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Esther Salas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANTONIO G. DESOUSA

Defendant

COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Letter from Antonio G. DeSousa re: change of email address. (sm) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, ) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number NEW040378), filed by ANTONIO G. DESOUSA. (Attachments: #1 NEF Consent)(qa, ) Modified on 8/27/2019 (qa, ). (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less