This case was last updated from PACER on 05/04/2020 at 08:58:52 (UTC).

Deskins v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of

Case Summary

On 03/05/2020 Deskins filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Social Security Administration, Commissioner of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christopher H Steger and Travis R McDonough. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00044

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christopher H Steger

Presiding Judge

Travis R McDonough

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donna Gail Deskins

Defendant

Social Security Administration, Commissioner of

Interested Party

SSA Office of General Counsel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Harry J Smith

Attorney at Smith & Cockett

P O Box 108

Mountain City, TN 37683-0108

 

Court Documents

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Gail Deskins. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served on 4/16/2020. (Smith, Harry) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Gail Deskins. SSA Office of General Counsel served on 4/16/2020. (Smith, Harry) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Gail Deskins. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served on 4/20/2020. (Smith, Harry) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE re IFP Service (Attorney Representation) re #4 Summons Issued as to USA (JCK) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons U.S. Attorney, #2 Summons U.S Attorney General)(JCK) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court shall send to Plaintiff's counsel the service packet to be completed by Counsel with appropriate instructions. It is Counsel's responsibility to return the service packet in a timely manner if the United States Marshall is to serve the complaint and summons for Plaintiff.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 4/1/20.This entry is the Order of the Court. There is no document attached. (KMG) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketDistrict Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (BDG) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Donna Gail Deskins. (Smith, Harry) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SSA COMPLAINT Complaint against Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, filed by Donna Gail Deskins. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons US Attorney General, #3 Summons General Counsel, #4 Summons US Attorney)(Smith, Harry) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less