This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/26/2020 at 10:09:37 (UTC).

Desiste v. Sobande

Case Summary

On 08/27/2020 Desiste filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Sobande. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Polk Failla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06947

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine Polk Failla

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bruce Desiste

Defendants

Solomon Sobande

Sounds Music Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian D. Caplan

Attorney at Reitler Kailas & Rosenblatt, L.L.C.

885 Third Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10022-7604

Julie B. Wlodinguer

Attorney at Reitler Kailas & Rosenblatt, L.L.C.

885 Third Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10022-7604

Defendant Attorneys

Sarah Michal Matz

Attorney at Adelman Matz P.C.

1173A Second Ave, Ste 153

Ny, NY 10065

Gary Philip Adelman

Attorney at Adelman Matz P.C.

1173A Second Ave, Ste 153

Ny, NY 10065

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A - Profit Sharing Agreement

1 #2

Exhibit B - August 8, 2019 Letter

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on November 19, 2020, at 12:30 p.m. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. (Initial Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 12:30 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/21/2020) (rro) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Solomon Sobande..(Matz, Sarah) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gary Philip Adelman on behalf of Solomon Sobande..(Adelman, Gary) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Michal Matz on behalf of Solomon Sobande..(Matz, Sarah) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Solomon Sobande served on 9/15/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. Service was accepted by Berta Delgado, Housekeeper. Document filed by Bruce Desiste..(Wlodinguer, Julie) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Solomon Sobande..(pne) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julie B. Wlodinguer on behalf of Bruce Desiste..(Wlodinguer, Julie) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Solomon Sobande a/k/a Sounds Music Group, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Bruce Desiste..(Caplan, Brian) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Caplan, Brian) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Solomon Sobande. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21364992)Document filed by Bruce Desiste. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Profit Sharing Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - August 8, 2019 Letter).(Caplan, Brian) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Julie B. Wlodinguer