This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/10/2020 at 07:15:16 (UTC).

Design Collection, Inc. v. Ross Stores, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/12/2019 Design Collection, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Ross Stores, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Rozella A. Oliver and Philip S. Gutierrez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-10538

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Rozella A. Oliver

Presiding Judge

Philip S. Gutierrez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Design Collection, Inc.

Defendants

DOES 1 through 10

Metro Girl, Inc.

Ross Stores, Inc.

Does 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen M Doniger

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Scott A Burroughs

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

David Shein

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Defendant Attorney

Stephen M Lobbin

Attorney at SML Avvocati PC

969 Hilgard Avenue Suite 1012

Los Angeles, CA 90024

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

#15

#16

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 4/13/2020, at 2:00 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (smo) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Metro Girl, Inc., Ross Stores, Inc., identifying None. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Metro Girl, Inc., Ross Stores, Inc..(Attorney Stephen M Lobbin added to party Metro Girl, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen M Lobbin added to party Ross Stores, Inc.(pty:dft))(Lobbin, Stephen) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Extension of Time To Respond To Complaint #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Normally an extension of time to respond to a complaint is done by Stipulation, not by Notice. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc., upon Defendant Metro Girl, Inc. served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Capitol Corporate Services, Inc c/o Leigh Johnson\Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc., upon Defendant Ross Stores, Inc. served on 12/17/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System c/o Daisy Montenegro - Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Metro Girl, Inc., Ross Stores, Inc. (et) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (et) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Design Collection, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc., (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24945028 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc.. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Design Collection, Inc.(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Design Collection, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Ross Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Shein

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen M Doniger