This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 06:56:19 (UTC).

Design Collection, Inc. v. High Secret Apparel Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 12/23/2019 Design Collection, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against High Secret Apparel Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alexander F. MacKinnon and Percy Anderson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-10853

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alexander F. MacKinnon

Presiding Judge

Percy Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Design Collection, Inc.

Defendants

High Secret Apparel Corp.

Meredith Corp.

SC Corporation

DOES 1 through 10

Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

SC Corporation a Delaware Corporation, individually doing business as Especially Yours

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen M Doniger

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Scott A Burroughs

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

David Shein

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

 

Court Documents

18 #1

Dismissal

#18

(#18) REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 Dismissal) (mrgo) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#17

(#17) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc.to Order to Show Cause, #15 (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc.. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#15

(#15) MINUTES- Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Percy Anderson. Accordingly, the court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff to show cause in writing on or before 2/3/2020, why this action should not be dismissed, as to High Secret Apparel Corp., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., and Meredith Corp., for lack of prosecution. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the court finds that this matter is appropriate for submission without oral argument. (et) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) (A)(i) as to SC Corporation. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#13

(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc., upon Defendant SC Corporation served on 12/31/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company c/o Lynanne Gaines\Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#12

(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc., upon Defendant Meredith Corp. served on 12/31/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company c/o Lynanne Gaines\Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#11

(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc., upon Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. served on 12/31/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company c/o Lynanne Gaines\Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#10

(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc., upon Defendant High Secret Apparel Corp. served on 12/31/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Saman Naimian\Authorized Agent for Service of Process in c/o K. Sorarian in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (et) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants SC Corporation, High Secret Apparel Corp., Meredith Corp., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (et) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#4

(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Design Collection, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc., (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25009916 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc.. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Design Collection, Inc.(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 Dismissal) (mrgo) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc.to Order to Show Cause, #15 (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc.. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MINUTES- Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Percy Anderson. Accordingly, the court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff to show cause in writing on or before 2/3/2020, why this action should not be dismissed, as to High Secret Apparel Corp., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., and Meredith Corp., for lack of prosecution. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the court finds that this matter is appropriate for submission without oral argument. (et) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) (A)(i) as to SC Corporation. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc., upon Defendant SC Corporation served on 12/31/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company c/o Lynanne Gaines\Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc., upon Defendant Meredith Corp. served on 12/31/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company c/o Lynanne Gaines\Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc., upon Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. served on 12/31/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company c/o Lynanne Gaines\Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc., upon Defendant High Secret Apparel Corp. served on 12/31/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Saman Naimian\Authorized Agent for Service of Process in c/o K. Sorarian in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (et) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants SC Corporation, High Secret Apparel Corp., Meredith Corp., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (et) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Design Collection, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc., (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25009916 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc.. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Design Collection, Inc.(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Design Collection, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where SC is a litigant

Latest cases where Meredith Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant