This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/22/2020 at 08:21:54 (UTC).

Design Collection, Inc. v. Haute Fox, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/23/2020 Design Collection, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Haute Fox, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Gary Klausner and Charles F. Eick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-03742

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

Referral Judge

Charles F. Eick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Design Collection, Inc.

Defendants

Haute Fox, Inc.

DOES 1 through 10

Image Clothing

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen M Doniger

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Scott A Burroughs

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

David Shein

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc., upon Defendant Haute Fox, Inc. served on 6/9/2020, answer due 6/30/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jun Hyuk Im\Registered Agent for Service of process in c/o Gustavo G. (refused last name) - Agent in charge authorized to accept service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Haute Fox, Inc., and Image Clothing. (jtil) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (jtil) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Design Collection, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc., (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26204282 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc.. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Design Collection, Inc.(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Design Collection, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Shein

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott A Burroughs

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen M Doniger